Trinet USA, Inc. v. Pigliavento
Plaintiff: Trinet USA, Inc.
Defendant: Kane Pigliavento
Not Classified By Court: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2020cv02018
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for April 5, 2021. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/26/2020. (AR)
October 26, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on April 5, 2021 before (Rosenwasser, Steven)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/13/2020. (TWL)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #19), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/13/2020. (TWL)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the January 2022 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 8/23/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/13/2020. (TWL)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rosenwasser, Steven)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement None Disclosed by Kane Pigliavento. (Tuschman, Richard)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kane Pigliavento. Related case(s): No (Tuschman, Richard)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kane Pigliavento.(Tuschman, Richard)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard David Tuschman on behalf of Kane Pigliavento. (Tuschman, Richard)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Trinet USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Trinet Group, Inc. for Trinet USA, Inc... (Rosenwasser, Steven)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Trinet USA, Inc. Related case(s): no (Rosenwasser, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by October 12, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/11/2020. (AR)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 9/5/2020 by Trinet USA, Inc. as to Kane Pigliavento. (LNR)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Kane Pigliavento by Trinet USA, Inc. (Molloy, Catherine)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Steven J. Rosenwasser may appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 9/3/2020. (MLM)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Steven J. Rosenwasser to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17269928 for $150 by Trinet USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Good Standing and Court Admissions)(Rosenwasser, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/31/2020. (TWL)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/31/2020. (TWL)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Kane Pigliavento. (CRH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Steven J. Rossenwasser of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-2018-T-33AAS. (SJB)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kane Pigliavento (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17241367) filed by Trinet USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(Molloy, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinet USA, Inc. v. Pigliavento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinet USA, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine H. Molloy
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kane Pigliavento
Represented By: Richard David Tuschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?