CCP SP Hotel, LLC v. Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC
In Re: Heritage Hotel Associations, LLC doing business as Hotel Indigo-St. Pete Downtown
Appellant: CCP SP Hotel, LLC
Appellee: Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC doing business as Hotel Indigo-St. Pete Downtown
Case Number: 8:2020cv02046
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal as moot #20. This file is closed. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/19/2020. (Jung, William)
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Moot filed by CCP SP Hotel, LLC. (Anthony, John)
October 6, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Moot by Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC. (Markham, Michael)
September 30, 2020 Filing 19 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Approval of Sale held on 8/25/20 before Judge Caryl E. Delano. (JNB)
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal filed by CCP SP Hotel, LLC. Bankruptcy transcript filed separately. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by CCP SP Hotel, LLC.(JNB)
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC hearing re #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal. ORAL ARGUMENT set for 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge William F. Jung. Counsel are directed to call the reserved conference toll-free number at 1-888-557-8511. Enter the access code: 4744914 followed by the # (pound) key. You will be prompted to enter the security code: 2046 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:30 AM so the hearing may start promptly at 10:00 AM.(SAO)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Continued Hearing on Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order held on 8/3/20 before Judge Caryl E. Delano. (JNB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order held on 7/30/20 before Judge Caryl E. Delano. (JNB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 7/28/20 before Judge Caryl E. Delano. (JNB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 BANKRUPCTY TRANSCRIPT of Post Confirmation Status Conference held on 6/10/20 before Judge Caryl E. Delano. (JNB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Pay Post-Petition Interest and Attorneys' Fees continued held on 5/20/20 before Judge Caryl E. Delano. (JNB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Pay Post-Petition Interest and Attorneys' Fees held on 5/12/20 before Judge Caryl E. Delano. (JNB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Post Confirmation Status Conference held on 4/20/20 before Judge Caryl E. Delano. (JNB)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court adopts the deadlines set forth at docket #6. Appellant's initial brief is due October 21, 2020; Appellee's answer brief is due November 4, 2020; and Appellant's reply brief is due November 13, 2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/18/2020. (CCB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by CCP SP Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 2 Appelle's designation, #2 3 Claim 27, #3 4 Claim 28, #4 5 Claim 29, #5 6 Claim 30, #6 7 Claim 31, #7 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000067_Disclosure_Statement_for_Debtors_Plan_of_Liquidation_Filed_by_Michael_C_Markham_on_behalf, #8 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000182_Ballot_Tabulation_Filed_by_Michael_C_Markham_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Heritage_Hotel_Associates, #9 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000298_Declaration_of_Norman_Giovenco_in_Support_of_Sale_Motion_Filed_by_Michael_C_Markham_on_beh, #10 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000299_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibits_in_Relation_to_August_25_2020_Hearing_Filed_by_John_A_Anthony_o, #11 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000299_Part_2_Exhibit_Exhibit_1, #12 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000299_Part_3_Exhibit_Exhibit_2, #13 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000299_Part_4_Exhibit_Exhibit_3, #14 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000299_Part_5_Exhibit_Exhibit_4, #15 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000299_Part_6_Exhibit_Exhibit_5, #16 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000299_Part_7_Exhibit_Exhibit_6, #17 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000300_Notice_of_Filing_Declaration_of_Andrew_Wright_in_Suppport_of_Sale_Motion_Filed_by_Scott_A, #18 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000301_Notice_of_CCPs_Syllabus_of_Authorities_Supporting_Arguments_at_Plenary_Hearing_Filed_by_J, #19 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000306_Motion_to_Augment_CCP_Closing_Distribution_Under_Final_Sale_Order_and_for_Related_Relief, #20 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000316_Response_to_CCPs_Motion_to_Augment_CCP_Closing_Proceeds_Under_Final_Sale_Order_Filed_by_M, #21 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000317_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_Filed_by_John_A_Anthony_on_behalf_of_Creditor_CCP_SP_Hotel, #22 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000325_Order_Granting_in_Part_and_Denying_in_Part_and_deferred_in_part_Motion_to_augment_CCP_Clos, #23 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000327_Opposition_Response_to_CCPs_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_Filed_by_Michael_C_Markham_on, #24 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000328_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_9-1-20_on_Calendar_Items_as_listed_in_Hearing_Proceeding, #25 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000332_Order_Denying_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal, #26 8-19-bk-09946_Docket_000338_Appellee_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_of_Appeal__Statement_of_Issues_o)(JN)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by CCP SP Hotel, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Anthony, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUGGESTION of Deadlines on Appeal by Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC. (Markham, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 8/31/2020. (LNR)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by CCP SP Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 1a Notice of Appeal, #2 2 Order on Appeal, #3 3 Order appealed doc no 304, #4 4 Docket, #5 6 Appellants Designation, #6 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_11, #7 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000066_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Liquidation__Filed_by_Michael_C_Markham_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Heritage_H, #8 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000086_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Reject_Option_with_Fit2Run_Establishing_Deadlines_Under_Section, #9 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000087_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Sell_Hotel_Property_Fee_and_Clear_of_All_Liens_and_Granting_Relat, #10 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000112_Notice_of_Filing_Closing_Statement_of_Fit2Run_Option_Transfer_Filed_by_Michael_C_Markham_o, #11 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000117_Order_Confirming_Chapter_11_Plan_and_Scheduling_Status_Conference, #12 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000119_Part_1_MotionApplication_to_Pay_Post-Petition_Interest_and_Attorneys_Fees_and_Costs_Pursuant_to, #13 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000119_Part_2_Exhibit_Composite_A, #14 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000119_Part_3_Exhibit_Composite_B, #15 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000119_Part_4_Exhibit_Composite_C, #16 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000121_Motion_to_Modify_Confirmed_Plan_re_Treatment_of_Valley_National_Bank_Filed_by_Michael_C_Ma, #17 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000144_Amended_Motion_to_Modify_Confirmed_Plan_for_Chapter_11_Filed_by_Michael_C_Markham_on_behal, #18 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000171_Order_Approving_Motion_To_Pay_Post-Petition_Interest_and_Attorneys_Fees_and_Costs_Pursuan, #19 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000180_Verified_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Approving_Valley_National_Banks_Motion_To_Pa, #20 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000186_Ballot_Tabulation, #21 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000195_Objection_to_Debtors_Modified_Plan_Filed_by_John_A_Anthony_on_behalf_of_Creditor_CCP_SP_H, #22 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000196_Objection_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Reconsideration_and_Rehearing_Filed_by_John_A_Anthony_on, #23 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000197_Part_1_Notice_of_TransferAssignment_of_Claim_From_Valley_National_Bank_to_CCP_SP_Hotel_LLC_File, #24 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000197_Part_2_trc, #25 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000206_Ballot_Tabulation, #26 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000243_Part_1_Verified_Motion_for_Termination_of_Automatic_Stay_and_to_Prohibit_Use_of_Cash_Collateral_f, #27 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000243_Part_2_Exhibit, #28 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000245_Emergency_Motion_for_Entry_of_an_Order, #29 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000252_Objection_to_Bidding_Procedures_Motion_Filed_by_John_A_Anthony_on_behalf_of_Creditor_CCP_S, #30 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000255_Supplement_to_Objection_To_Bidding_Procedures_Motion_Filed_by_John_A_Anthony_on_behalf_of, #31 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000261_Supplemental_Objection_to_CCPs_Second_Supplement_to_Its_Objection_to_Bidding_Procedures_M, #32 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000277_Motion_to_Sell_Property_Free_and_Clear_of_Liens_Property_description_Substantially_all_o, #33 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000279_Supplement_to_Amended_Motion_to_Modify_Confirmed_Plan_for_Chapter_11_Filed_by_Michael_C_Ma, #34 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000287_Objection_to_Sale_Motion_and_Supplement_to_Debtors_Amended_Motion_to_Modify_Confirmed_Pla, #35 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000288_Supplemental_Response_to_Rehearing_Motion_Filed_by_Debtor_Regarding_ 506, #36 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000291_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Reconsideration_of_Order_Approving_Valley_National_Banks_Motion, #37 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000295_Notice_of_Qualified_Bids_Filed_by_Michael_C_Markham_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Heritage_Hotel_Ass, #38 8-19-bk-9946_Docket_000297_Declaration_of_Preston_Reid_in_Support_of_Sale_Motion_Filed_by_Michael_C_Markham_on_behalf)(JN)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties are directed to confer, and suggest to the Court, a schedule for compilation of the record and for briefing. Please provide these dates by filing on this docket no later than September 18, 2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/8/2020. (Jung, William)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/2/2020. (SAO)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by CCP SP Hotel, LLC. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:19-bk-09946-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CCP SP Hotel, LLC v. Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Heritage Hotel Associations, LLC doing business as Hotel Indigo-St. Pete Downtown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CCP SP Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Lydia Marie Gazda
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Represented By: Nicholas Lafalce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Heritage Hotel Associates, LLC doing business as Hotel Indigo-St. Pete Downtown
Represented By: Michael C. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?