Isner-Monticello v. Nelnet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Isner-Monticello
Defendant: Nelnet, Inc., Nelnet Servicing, LLC and Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02135
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. In light of Plaintiff's having filed an Amended Complaint as a matter of course, Defendants' Motion is denied as moot. Defendants shall be free to reassert any of the challenges raised therein to the extent that they remain viable against the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/9/2020. (MWC)
November 9, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demand against Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Kimberly Isner-Monticello.(Dunivan, Bryant)
October 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet, Inc.. (Berry, Naomi)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Berry, Naomi)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet, Inc.. (Berry, Naomi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Johnson on behalf of Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet, Inc. (Johnson, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including October 28, 2020 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/7/2020. (MWC)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and Memorandum of Law In Support by Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet, Inc. (Berry, Naomi) Modified on 10/8/2020 (TDC).
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Naomi Massave Berry on behalf of Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet, Inc. (Berry, Naomi)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kimberly Isner-Monticello. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Main Document)(Dunivan, Bryant)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/14/2020. (CRB)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/14/2020. (CRB)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Bryant Dunivan, Jr. of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRH)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet, Inc. (CRH)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet, Inc. with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 61836 filed by Kimberly Isner-Monticello.(CRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isner-Monticello v. Nelnet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Johnson
Represented By: Naomi Massave Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel C. Johnson
Represented By: Naomi Massave Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Daniel C. Johnson
Represented By: Naomi Massave Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Isner-Monticello
Represented By: Bryant Dunivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?