Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S v. General Electric Co. et al
Plaintiff: SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S
Defendant: General Electric Co. and GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02281
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #12 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. Related case(s): no (Thielhelm, Robert)
October 16, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S identifying Corporate Parent Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy S.A. for Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S.. (Thielhelm, Robert)
October 16, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of compliance by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S (Rose, Harrison)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Plaintiff's Motion for Justin Donoho to Withdraw. Attorney Justin R. Donoho is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorneys Sigmund, Jr., Gannon, Rupert, Rose, and Thielhelm, Jr. to remain counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/14/2020. (ACS)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Harrison Rose may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Robert Thielhelm, Jr. designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements.Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/14/2020. (ACS)
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of compliance by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S (Gannon, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Justin Donoho to Withdraw as Attorney by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of compliance by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S (Sigmond, Leif)
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF of service by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S (Thielhelm, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Harrison B. Rose to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17420976 for $150 by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motions to Appear pro hac vice (Docs. 14-16). Attorneys Leif Sigmund, Jr., Michael Gannon, and Douglas Rupert may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Robert Thielhelm, Jr. designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/5/2020. (ACS)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Douglas Rupert to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17384876 for $150 by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Michael D. Gannon to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17384834 for $150 by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leif R. Sigmond, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17384827 for $150 by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/2/2020. (CRB)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/2/2020. (CRB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to GE Renewables North America, LLC, General Electric Co. (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Thielhelm, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel Michael D. Gannon of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Leif R. Sigmond, Jr. of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Justin R. Donoho of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Harrison B. Rose of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Douglas S. Rupert of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H). (TDC)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-2281-T-35SPF. (SJB)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Jury Demand against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17364299) filed by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thielhelm, Robert) Modified on 9/30/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S v. General Electric Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE RENEWABLES NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY A/S
Represented By: Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Rupert
Represented By: Justin R. Donoho
Represented By: Michael D. Gannon
Represented By: Leif R. Sigmond, Jr.
Represented By: Harrison B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?