Haulsee et al v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Plaintiff: Michael Haulsee and Marcia Haulsee
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company America's
Case Number: 8:2020cv02410
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 TRANSFER IN from the Nothern District of Florida (Pensacola Division). Case assigned to District Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New Case Number: 8:20-cv-2410-T-60SPF. (AG)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-05820. File received electronically
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Accordingly, because venue is proper in the Middle District of Florida and no party has objected to transfer there, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Middle District of Florida and close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
October 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Response to Order to Show Cause, #5 Order to Show Cause - No response filed by Plaintiffs, #10 Request for Judicial Notice. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANKS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF RELATED APPEAL AND PUBLIC RECORDS re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (NORROW, BETH) Modified on 10/13/2020 to correct title (jcw). [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS re #5 Order to Show Cause, . (NORROW, BETH) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/21/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (NORROW, BETH) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS answer due 10/7/2020.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/30/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Response to Complaint by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (NORROW, BETH) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Accordingly, within ten (10) days (10/9/2020) of this Order, the parties are directed to file a response indicating whether they have any objection to transferring this case to the Middle District of Florida, and if so, stating the reasons underlying that objection. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/29/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED, as requested. (Answer due 9/30/2020.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/24/2020. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
September 23, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (NORROW, BETH) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
September 16, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO). (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. A reminder that party names are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas from Okaloosa Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-002507-F. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5650987.), filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Uniform Final Judgment, #4 Exhibit Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (NORROW, BETH) [Transferred from flnd on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haulsee et al v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Haulsee
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Haulsee
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company America's
Represented By: Jason H. Okleshen
Represented By: Beth Ann Norrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?