Northgate Holdings, LLC et al v. Copper Leaf, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wesley I. Edwards, CRE Group II, LLC and Northgate Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Terry A. Lewison, Copper Leaf, LLC and Rodger D. May
Case Number: 8:2020cv02604
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. #9). Because no answer or motion for summary judgment has been filed in this case, dismissal without prejudice via unilateral notice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) is permissible. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/18/2020. (AR)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by CRE Group II, LLC, Wesley I. Edwards, Northgate Holdings, LLC. (Belt, Townsend)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/17/2020. (TWL)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by December 14, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/17/2020. (AR)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 11/09/20 by Northgate Holdings, LLC, Wesley I. Edwards, CRE Group II, LLC as to Copper Leaf, LLC. (Belt, Townsend)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 11/06/2020 by Northgate Holdings, LLC, Wesley I. Edwards, CRE Group II, LLC as to Rodger D. May. (Belt, Townsend)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 11/06/2020 by Northgate Holdings, LLC, Wesley I. Edwards, CRE Group II, LLC as to Terry A. Lewison. (Belt, Townsend)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Copper Leaf, LLC, Terry A. Lewison, Rodger D. May. (CRH)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-2604-T-33JSS. (LRB)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Copper Leaf, LLC, Terry A. Lewison, Rodger D. May with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113A-17520442) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Combined Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet , #3 Proposed Summons)(Belt, Townsend) Modified on 11/6/2020 to edit text (CRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northgate Holdings, LLC et al v. Copper Leaf, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry A. Lewison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Leaf, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodger D. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley I. Edwards
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Represented By: Lydia Marie Gazda
Represented By: Townsend Joseph Belt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRE Group II, LLC
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Represented By: Lydia Marie Gazda
Represented By: Townsend Joseph Belt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northgate Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Represented By: Lydia Marie Gazda
Represented By: Townsend Joseph Belt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?