St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc. v. Aclara Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Itron, Inc. and Aclara Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02826
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #8 Interested persons order by St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent St. James Financial Holdings Company, Corporate Parent St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc., Corporate Parent St. Johns Financial Holding Company for St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc... (Brown, Tyler)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #17 Plaintiff St. Johns Insurance Company's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Plaintiff St. Johns Insurance Company shall have up to and including January 29, 2021 to file its Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/15/2021. (AKJ)
January 15, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Aclara Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Meter Readings Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Meter Readings Holding I Corp. for Aclara Technologies, LLC.. (Eubanks, Cameron)
January 15, 2021 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File corporate disclosures by St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc. (Brown, Tyler) Modified on 1/15/2021 (TDC).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #13 Plaintiff St. John[s'] Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement; GRANTING #15 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Plaintiff St. Johns Insurance Company and Defendant Aclara Technologies, LLC shall have up to and including January 15, 2021 to file their certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statements. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/11/2021. (AKJ)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aclara Technologies, LLC. (Eubanks, Cameron)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc. Related case(s): no (Brown, Tyler) Modified on 1/12/2021 (TDC).
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosures by St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc. (Brown, Tyler) Modified on 1/12/2021 (TDC).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #10 Defendant Aclara Technologies, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Defendant Aclara Technologies, LLC shall have up to and including January 11, 2021 to file its certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/29/2020. (AKJ)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Itron, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Reilly, Michael)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aclara Technologies, LLC. (Eubanks, Cameron)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 TERMIANTED. NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Itron, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Reilly, Michael) NOTE: Correct document filed at Dkt. 11. Modified on 12/29/2020 (LD).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/14/2020. (CRB)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/14/2020. (CRB)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aclara Technologies, LLC.(Eubanks, Cameron)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Itron, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Itron, Inc. for Itron, Inc. (Reilly, Michael) Modified text on 12/11/2020 (AG).
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Reilly on behalf of Itron, Inc. (Reilly, Michael)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 Itron's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Itron, Inc..(Reilly, Michael)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-2826-T-35AAS. (SJB)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tenth Judicial Circuit of Polk County, case number 2020-CA-003247 filed in State Court on October 23, 2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17609055 filed by Aclara Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Summons to Aclara Technologies, LLC, #4 State Court Other Documents Summons to Itron, Inc., #5 Exhibit Service of Process on Aclara Technologies, Inc., #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eubanks, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc. v. Aclara Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itron, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aclara Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Eubanks
Represented By: Christopher E. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Daniel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?