Lynch v. Harper et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Lynch
Defendant: Premier Community Healthcare Group, M.D. Bhaskar Golla, United States, Pioneer Medical Group, M.D. Carlos Ramos, Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, Inc., Rose Radiology Centers, Inc., M.D. Jennifer Harper, Pasco-Pinellas Hillsborough Community Health System, Inc., M.D. Donna Connors, Premier Community Healthcare Group, Inc., Pioneer Medical Group, PL., Jennifer Harper, M.D., Carlos Ramos, M.D., Rose Radiology Centers, LLC, United States of America, Bhaskar Golla, M.D. and Donna Connors, M.D.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02895
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Grace Showalter on behalf of Bhaskar Golla, MD (Showalter, Brittany)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian David Murry on behalf of Christopher Lynch (Murry, Brian)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Lawrence Schieffelin, Jr on behalf of Pasco-Pinellas Hillsborough Community Health System, Inc. (Schieffelin, Thomas)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Nast Ferrentino on behalf of Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, Inc. (Ferrentino, Victoria)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by United States of America.(Kenneth, Michael)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Marc Goodis on behalf of Bhaskar Golla, MD (Goodis, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Designation of Email Addresses Appearance by Erin Bowles Reynolds on behalf of Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, Inc. (Reynolds, Erin)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 the United States' Unopposed Motion to Substitute Party. Defendants Premier Community Healthcare Group, Inc., Donna Connors, MD and Jennifer Harper, MD are dismissed from this case. The United States is substituted as a Defendant in their place. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 12/18/2020. (DMB)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by United States of America. (Kenneth, Michael)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***TERMINATED-COUUNSEL CANNOT FILE ON BEHALF OF ANOTHER COUNSEL. SIGNATURE BLOCK AND ECF LOGIN MUST MATCH. EACH COUNSEL NEEDS TO FILE INDIVIDUAL NOTICE OF APPEARANCES ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES** NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Marc Goodis on behalf of Bhaskar Golla, MD (Goodis, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/18/2020 (LSS).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record by Donna Connors, MD, Jennifer Harper, MD, Premier Community Healthcare Group, Inc., United States re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents 1 and 4 through 50, #5 State Court Other Documents 51 through 100, #6 State Court Other Documents 101 through 150, #7 State Court Other Documents 151 through 187) (JLD)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 the United States' Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. The United States shall file a response to the Complaint on or before 1/14/21. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 12/8/2020.(DMB)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by United States. (Kenneth, Michael)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by United States [of Substitution] (Kenneth, Michael)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (CAB)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-2895-T-24AAS. (SJB)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pinellas County, case number 20-CA-1732 filed in State Court on 08/03/2020. filed by Donna Connors, Jennifer Harper, Premier Community Healthcare Group. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kenneth, Michael) Modified on 12/8/2020 (JLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. Harper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Community Healthcare Group
Represented By: Michael Kenneth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Bhaskar Golla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Carlos Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, Inc.
Represented By: Victoria Nast Ferrentino
Represented By: Erin Bowles Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Radiology Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Jennifer Harper
Represented By: Michael Kenneth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasco-Pinellas Hillsborough Community Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Schieffelin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Donna Connors
Represented By: Michael Kenneth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Community Healthcare Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Kenneth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Medical Group, PL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Harper, M.D.
Represented By: Michael Kenneth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Ramos, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Radiology Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Kenneth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhaskar Golla, M.D.
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Goodis
Represented By: Brittany Grace Showalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Connors, M.D.
Represented By: Michael Kenneth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lynch
Represented By: David Aaron Paul
Represented By: Olivia T. Kronenberg
Represented By: Brian David Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?