Suncoast Waterkeeper v. Suncoast Metals et al
Plaintiff: Suncoast Waterkeeper
Defendant: Paradise Properties of Longboat Key, Suncoast Metals, Suncoast Metals, LLC and Paradise Properties of Longboat Key, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00144
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Paradise Properties of Longboat Key, LLC, Suncoast Metals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hennessy, Kevin)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER disclosing prior involvement in other cases involving the plaintiff. See order for details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/15/2021. (MLM)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/12/2021. (TWL)
March 11, 2021 Filing 22 CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Suncoast Waterkeeper. (Flanders, Jason)
March 11, 2021 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A to CMR)(Flanders, Jason)
March 11, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Suncoast Waterkeeper. (Flanders, Jason)
March 11, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Paradise Properties of Longboat Key, LLC, Suncoast Metals, LLC. (Hennessy, Kevin)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting the motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #15). Response now due March 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/25/2021. (DMD)
February 24, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of compliance re 16 Order on Motion for Extension of time to Answer, #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Paradise Properties of Longboat Key, LLC, Suncoast Metals, LLC. (Hennessy, Kevin)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER deferring ruling on the motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint (Doc. #15) until Defendants supplement their Local Rule 3.01(g) certification. See Local Rule 3.01(g)(3)("If the opposing party is unavailable before the motion's filing, the movant after filing must try diligently for three days to contact the opposing party. Promptly after either contact or expiration of the three days, the movant must supplement the motion with a statement certifying whether the parties have resolved all or part of the motion. Failure to timely supplement can result in denial of the motion without prejudice."). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/24/2021. (DMD)
February 24, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Hennessy, Kevin)
February 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Janine Poot on behalf of Suncoast Metals, LLC and Paradise Properties of Longboat Key, LLC(Poot, Nicole) Modified on 2/23/2021 (BES).
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin S. Hennessy on behalf of Suncoast Metals, LLC and Paradise Properties of Longboat Key, LLC(Hennessy, Kevin) Modified on 2/23/2021 (BES).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by March 11, 2021, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/9/2021. (DMD)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 2/4 by Suncoast Waterkeeper as to Suncoast Metals, LLC. (Flanders, Jason)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 2/4/21 by Suncoast Waterkeeper as to Suncoast Waterkeeper. (Flanders, Jason)
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 2/4/21 by Suncoast Waterkeeper as to Paradise Properties of Longboat Key, LLC. (Flanders, Jason)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jason Flanders may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel complete the E-Filer Registration for access to CM/ECF (https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/webforms/e-filer-registration-form) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/4/2021. (MLM)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Jason Flanders to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17850468 for $150 by Suncoast Waterkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bloom, Justin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Suncoast Metals, LLC. (LNR)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Suncoast Waterkeeper. (Bloom, Justin)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Paradise Properties of Longboat Key, LLC. (LNR)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Suncoast Waterkeeper. (Bloom, Justin)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-0144-T-33AAS. (SJB)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Civil Penalties against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17784741) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bloom, Justin) Modified text on 1/20/2021 (AG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suncoast Waterkeeper v. Suncoast Metals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suncoast Waterkeeper
Represented By: Justin Bloom
Represented By: Jason R. Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Properties of Longboat Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncoast Metals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncoast Metals, LLC
Represented By: Nicole Janine Poot
Represented By: Kevin S. Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Properties of Longboat Key, LLC
Represented By: Nicole Janine Poot
Represented By: Kevin S. Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?