Aileron Investment Management, LLC v. American Lending Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Aileron Investment Management, LLC
Defendant: American Lending Center, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00146
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING #18 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; GRANTING #18 Defendant's Motion to Strike Special Damages Demand. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/12/2021. (MWC)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 05-14-2021. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Mooney, Brian)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on May 14, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Brian Mooney, Esquire. (Sbar, Jonathan)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 3/11/2022. Jury Trial set for the MAY 2022 TRIAL TERM, which commences May 2, 2022, with a more precise trial date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/22/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/11/2021. (CRB)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimMotion to Strike filed by Aileron Investment Management, LLC. (Sbar, Jonathan)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sbar, Jonathan)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by American Lending Center, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Regional Centers Holding Group, Inc. for American Lending Center, LLC.. (Wischmeier, Julia)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike Special Damages Demand by American Lending Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wischmeier, Julia)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia M. Wischmeier on behalf of American Lending Center, LLC. (Wischmeier, Julia) Modified on 2/25/2021 (TDC).
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Aileron Investment Management, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Sbar, Jonathan)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Aileron Investment Management, LLC. (Sbar, Jonathan)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE to counsel Jacob V. Bradley Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLJ)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jacob V. Bradley may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel complete the E-Filer Registration for access to CM/ECF (https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/webforms/e-filer-registration-form) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/5/2021. (MLM)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Jacob v. Bradley to appear pro hac vice by American Lending Center, LLC. (Brown, Benjamin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY AND DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL for Jacob V. Bradley by American Lending Center, LLC. (Brown, Benjamin) Modified on 2/5/2021 (LD).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY AND DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL for Jacob V. Bradley by American Lending Center, LLC. (Brown, Benjamin). Modified on 2/5/2021 (LD).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROOF of service by American Lending Center, LLC. (Brown, Benjamin) Modified on 1/29/2021 (TDC).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Bruce Brown on behalf of American Lending Center, LLC. (Brown, Benjamin) Modified on 1/29/2021 (TDC).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Aileron Investment Management, LLC of filing Civil Cover Sheet (Rocke, Robert)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to American Lending Center, LLC. (JLD)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Robert L. Rocke, Jonathan B. Sbar, and Andrea K. Holder of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other). (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLD)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-0146-T-35AAS. (SJB)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Aileron Investment Management, LLC. (Rocke, Robert)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Lending Center, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17786386) filed by Aileron Investment Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rocke, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aileron Investment Management, LLC v. American Lending Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Lending Center, LLC
Represented By: Jacob V. Bradley
Represented By: Benjamin Bruce Brown
Represented By: Julia M. Wischmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aileron Investment Management, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan B. Sbar
Represented By: Andrea K. Holder
Represented By: Robert L. Rocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?