Avila v. Potter et al
Plaintiff: Lori Avila
Defendant: Ashley Potter and Patrick Potter
Case Number: 8:2021cv00267
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Transmittal of Record to State Court by the 6th Judicial Circuit - Pinellas County. (LD)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing CDC Declaration as Exhibit to #2 Emergency Motion to Stay Writ of Possession by Ashley Potter, Patrick Potter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AG)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REMANDING this case sua sponte for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/4/2021. (APF)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel David A. Peek of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ashley Potter. (AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for continuance on Writ of Possession by Ashley Potter, Patrick Potter. (AG)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Judicial Circuit County Court in and for Pinellas County, Florida, case number 20-007519-0 filed in State Court on 12/16/2020. filed by Patrick Potter, Ashley Potter. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents Pending Motion)(AG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avila v. Potter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Avila
Represented By: David A. Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?