Read v. Fay Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: sandra read
Defendant: Elizon Master Participation Trust I, Fay Servicing LLC, U.S. Bank Trust National Association and Fay Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00369
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed motion to withdraw the notice of removal. (Doc. #7). The Clerk is directed to remand this case to the Sixth Judicial Circuit Court in and for Pinellas County, Florida. After remand, the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/26/2021. (LEA)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal or Consent to Remand by Elizon Master Participation Trust I, Fay Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Anderson, Terrance)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by March 4, 2021, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/18/2021. (LEA)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff Sandra Read filed this action in state court on December 31, 2020. (Doc. # 1-1). On February 16, 2021, Defendants Fay Servicing, LLC, Elizon Master Participation Trust I, and U.S. Bank Trust National Association removed the action to federal court on the basis of diversity jurisdiction. (Doc. # 1). Defendants assert there is complete diversity of citizenship because Read is a citizen of Florida, while U.S. Bank (as owner trustee of the trust) is a national banking association with a main office in Minnesota, and Fay Servicing is "a single member LLC wholly owned by Fay Management, LLC," which is "a Delaware LLC, with its principal place of business in Chicago, IL." (Id. at 2-3). Defendants therefore assert that Fay Servicing is a citizen of Illinois for diversity purposes. However, where an LLC has, as one of its members, another LLC, "the citizenship of unincorporated associations must be traced through however many layers of partners or members there may be" to determine the citizenship of the LLC. Hart v. Terminex Int'l, 336 F.3d 541, 543 (7th Cir. 2003). Accordingly, Defendants are directed to provide additional information establishing the citizenships of all members of Fay Management, LLC by February 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/18/2021. (LEA)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Niles B. Whitten of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLD)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Niles B. Whitten of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLD)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-0369-VMC-SPF. (SJB)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit Court in and for Pinellas County Florida, case number 20-006143-CI filed in State Court on December 31, 2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17891771 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Terrance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Read v. Fay Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizon Master Participation Trust I
Represented By: Terrance Wayne Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing LLC
Represented By: Terrance Wayne Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By: Terrance Wayne Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Terrance Wayne Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: sandra read
Represented By: Niles Bradley Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?