Keller v. Defalco et al
Plaintiff: Scott Keller
Defendant: Lisa Defalco and TPG Telemanagement, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00433
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case; directing the Clerk to reopen the case; reinstating the deadlines set forth in the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order #37. This case remains set for a jury trial on the Court's September 2022 trial calendar, and the Pretrial Conference is set for 8/3/2022. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 4/11/2022. (SLB)
March 18, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION to Reopen Case by Scott Keller. (Kucharz, Kevin)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER that on the basis of the Mediation Report indicating settlement, this cause is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right of any party to re-open the action within 60 days, upon good cause shown, or to submit a stipulated form of final judgment. The Clerk is directed to close the case and terminate all pending motions. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 1/18/2022. (SLB)
January 18, 2022 Filing 45 MEDIATION report Hearing held on January 14, 2022. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Heilig, Marquis)
January 14, 2022 Filing 44 ***TERMINATED AS DISCOVERY*** DEPOSITION of Lisa DeFalco taken on 1.20.2022 by Scott Keller. RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION. (Evans, Jake) Modified on 1/18/2022 (LSS).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #41 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines; denying as moot #42 Request for Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 12/21/2021. (SLB)
December 16, 2021 Filing 42 REQUEST for oral argument re #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES by Scott Keller. (Evans, Jake)
December 15, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES by Scott Keller. (Evans, Jake)
November 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER denying #39 Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. The Court granted an identical motion and entered an Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order #37 on 10/4/2021. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 11/14/2021. (SLB)
November 12, 2021 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES by Scott Keller. (Evans, Jake)
November 11, 2021 Filing 38 ***TERMINATED-DOCUMENT ATTACHED IS NOT A MOTION. COUNSEL TO REFILE***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re #37 Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES by Scott Keller. (Evans, Jake) Modified on 11/12/2021 (LSS).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2022; Dispositive motions due by 3/14/2022; Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 8:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew; Conduct mediation hearing by 2/25/2022. This case is set for a jury trial on the Court's September 2022 trial calendar. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 10/4/2021. (SLB)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #34 Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. An amended scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 10/4/2021. (SLB)
September 30, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #21 Amended Complaint by Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc.(Holbrook, Kelly) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (MCB).
September 28, 2021 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES by Scott Keller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Evans, Jake)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #24 Defendant Lisa DeFalco's Amended Partial Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss or Strike Punitive Damage Claim. Defendants shall file their Answer to the Amended Complaint by 9/29/2021. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 9/22/2021. (SLB)
July 7, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Adam Kiel on behalf of Scott Keller (Kiel, Luke)
July 2, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Thomas Kucharz on behalf of Scott Keller (Kucharz, Kevin)
July 2, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of change of address by Jake Cullen Evans (Evans, Jake)
July 1, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss or Strike Punitive Damage Claim filed by Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc.. (Holbrook, Kelly)
June 28, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Selection of Mediator by Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc.. (Holbrook, Kelly)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 motion for leave to file a reply of no more than seven pages on or before 7/1/2021. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 6/24/2021. (SLB)
June 23, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Ms. DeFalco's Partial Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss or Strike Punitive Damage Claim by Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc.. (Holbrook, Kelly)
June 15, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss or Strike Punitive Damage Claim filed by Scott Keller. (Evans, Jake)
May 25, 2021 Filing 24 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss or Strike Punitive Damage Claim by All Defendants. (Holbrook, Kelly)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #22 Motion to Dismiss Count III and Partial Motion to Dismiss or Strike Punitive Damage Claim. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 5/25/2021. (SLB)
May 24, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss or Strike Punitive Damage Claim by Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc.. (Holbrook, Kelly)
May 10, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Evans, Jake)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/15/2021, Dispositive motions due by 1/28/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2022 at 8:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew, Conduct mediation hearing by 1/11/2022. This case is set for a jury trial on the Court's July 2022 trial calendar. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 4/29/2021. (SLB)
April 28, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Scott Keller identifying Other Affiliate TPG Telemanagement Inc. for Scott Keller.. (Punzone, Paul)
April 28, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc.. (Holbrook, Kelly)
April 28, 2021 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Punzone, Paul)
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint, by Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc..(Holbrook, Kelly)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Leonard K. Samuels is terminated from the docket sheet. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 4/19/2021. (JD)
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leonard K. Samuels to Withdraw as Attorney by Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc.. (Samuels, Leonard)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due on or before 4/19/2021. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 4/5/2021. (SLB)
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Holbrook, Kelly)
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly B. Holbrook on behalf of Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc. (Holbrook, Kelly)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Responsive pleading due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 3/22/2021. (SLB)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING] by Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc.. (Samuels, Leonard)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on March 1, 2021 by Scott Keller as to TPG Telemanagement, Inc.. (Punzone, Paul)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on March 1, 20221 by Scott Keller as to Lisa Defalco. (Punzone, Paul)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc. (LSS)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Scott Keller. (Punzone, Paul)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Scott Keller. (Punzone, Paul)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (CAB)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-0433-SCB-JSS. (SJB)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lisa Defalco, TPG Telemanagement, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17922025) filed by Scott Keller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Punzone, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. Defalco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Defalco
Represented By: Leonard K. Samuels
Represented By: Kelly B. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Telemanagement, Inc.
Represented By: Leonard K. Samuels
Represented By: Kelly B. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Keller
Represented By: Paul Joseph Punzone
Represented By: Jake Cullen Evans
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Kucharz
Represented By: Luke Adam Kiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?