Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. v. Genesis Motor America, LLC
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Motors, Inc.
Defendant: Genesis Motor America, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00974
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0015
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael L. Turrill, appearing on behalf of Genesis Motor America, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA064192.) Related document: #16 MOTION for Michael L. Turrill to appear pro hac vice . (ABC)
June 17, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Genesis Motor America, LLC of Filing Payment Confirmation (Bertron, James)
June 16, 2021 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Forehand, John)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 6/16/2021. (MLM)
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ginger Barry Boyd on behalf of Genesis Motor America, LLC (Boyd, Ginger)
June 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Michael L. Turrill to appear pro hac vice by Genesis Motor America, LLC. (Bertron, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Laura M. Groen to appear pro hac vice by Genesis Motor America, LLC. (Bertron, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Ryan L. Ford to appear pro hac vice by Genesis Motor America, LLC. (Bertron, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by June 17, 2021, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/3/2021. (LEA)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Genesis Motor America, LLC. (Bertron, James)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Genesis Motor America, LLC.(Bertron, James)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Genesis Motor America, LLC. (BES)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 8 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate JJF Management Services, Inc. for Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. (Forehand, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/29/2021. (TWL)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Payment of Filing Fee (Forehand, John)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Forehand, John)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-0974-VMC-AAS. (SJB)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Genesis Motor America with Jury Demand filed by Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forehand, John) Modified on 4/23/2021 (JLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald Motors, Inc. v. Genesis Motor America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Motor America, LLC
Represented By: Ryan L. Ford
Represented By: Michael L. Turrill
Represented By: Ginger Barry Boyd
Represented By: James Andrew Bertron, Jr.
Represented By: Laura M. Groen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Motors, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Forehand
Represented By: Robert Craig Spickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?