Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company v. Lenric, C21, Ltd., et al
Plaintiff: Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company
Defendant: Pet Supply Imports, Inc., Amazon.Com Services LLC, Lenric International, Ltd, Lenric C21, Ltd., Lenric International Ltd. and Amazon.com Services, LLC
Interested Party: Kelly Riley
Case Number: 8:2021cv01106
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 14 STATUS report by Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company. (Rathet, Brooks)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER: On June 21, 2021, the Court entered an order directing Plaintiff Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company to "file a status report by June 28, 2021, regarding its efforts to effect service of process upon all Defendants." (Doc. # 12). However, a review of the docket reveals that no such status report has been filed. Accordingly, Tower Hill is directed to file the status report by July 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/29/2021. (AR)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company filed this case on May 6, 2021. (Doc. #1). Therefore, service of process on the domestic Defendants is due by August 4, 2021. Based on the Court's review of the docket, it appears that service of process has not yet been effected on any of the Defendants. Accordingly, Tower Hill is directed to file a status report by June 28, 2021, regarding its efforts to effect service of process upon all Defendants. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/21/2021. (AR)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company.(Bromagen, William)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1) is sua sponte dismissed as a shotgun pleading. Plaintiff Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company may file an amended complaint that is not a shotgun pleading by June 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/9/2021. (AR)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/13/2021. (TWL)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of intent to file by Kelly Riley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AG)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-1106-VMC-SPF. (SJB)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tower Hill Signature Insurance Holdings, Inc for Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company. (Rathet, Brooks)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services, LLC, Lenric C21, Ltd., Pet Supply Imports, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18224765) filed by Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Policy)(Rathet, Brooks) Modified text on 5/7/2021 (LNR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company v. Lenric, C21, Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks C. Rathet
Represented By: William L. Bromagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Supply Imports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenric International, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenric C21, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenric International Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kelly Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?