Boudreau et al v. Nocco
Plaintiff: Lawrence Boudreau and Wanda Boudreau
Defendant: Sheriff Chris Nocco
Case Number: 8:2021cv01158
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Grant, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. 1) by Chris Nocco. (Grant, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Chris Nocco. Related case(s): Yes (Grant, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Chris Nocco. (Grant, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to respond. (Doc. #12). Response to the complaint now due July 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/23/2021. (DMD)
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Chris Nocco. (Grant, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lawrence Boudreau, Wanda Boudreau. (Solnick, Peter)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lawrence Boudreau, Wanda Boudreau. Related case(s): Yes (Solnick, Peter)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by July 7, 2021, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/15/2021. (DMD)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 6/2/2021 by Lawrence Boudreau, Wanda Boudreau as to Chris Nocco. (Solnick, Peter)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiffs are directed to file a status report on their efforts to perfect service of process on Defendant by June 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/14/2021. (DMD)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Chris Nocco. (BES)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-1158-VMC-AEP. (SJB)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Nocco with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18248286) filed by Lawrence Boudreau, Wanda Boudreau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Solnick, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreau et al v. Nocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Boudreau
Represented By: Peter J. Solnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Boudreau
Represented By: Peter J. Solnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Chris Nocco
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Grant
Represented By: Robert D. Holborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?