Bonayer et al v. Crowd Machine, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Bonayer and George Bachiashvili
Defendant: Crowd Machine, Inc., Metavine, Inc., Kurt Pfluger, Ben Gorlick, Crowd Machine SEZC, Anne Osborne, James Hanley, Charlie Shrem, Bitrexx, Camden Dore, Craig Sproule, Roger Tichenor and Hitbtc
Case Number: 8:2021cv01529
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #23--notice of voluntary dismissal; dismissing the action without prejudice; directing the clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/8/2021. (DAS)
September 7, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by George Bachiashvili (Bonderud, Andrew)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20--Motion for Extension of Time; extending until September 24, 2021, the time within which Roger Tichenor must respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/19/2021. (BK)
August 18, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by George Bachiashvili. (Bonderud, Andrew)
August 18, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Roger Tichenor. (Serrano, Meghan)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11--motion for an extension of time; extending through 9/24/2021 the time within which Shrem must respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/16/2021. (BK)
August 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jounice Laverne Nealy-Brown on behalf of Charlie Shrem (Nealy-Brown, Jounice)
August 16, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Teresa L. Huggins (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA064638.) Related document: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Teresa L. Huggins to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
August 16, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Brian E. Klein (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA064638.) Related document: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Brian E. Klein to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
August 16, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kevin M. Casey (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA064638.) Related document: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Kevin Michael Casey to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
August 13, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by George Bachiashvili. (Bonderud, Andrew)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Schifino, Jr on behalf of Charlie Shrem (Schifino, William)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Brian Klein, Teresa Huggins, and Kevin Michael Casey may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Charlie Shrem. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(c)(5).Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/10/2021. (ACS)
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Kevin Michael Casey to appear pro hac vice by Charlie Shrem. (Dietrich, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Teresa L. Huggins to appear pro hac vice by Charlie Shrem. (Dietrich, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Brian E. Klein to appear pro hac vice by Charlie Shrem. (Dietrich, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint by Charlie Shrem. (Dietrich, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Charlie Shrem. (Dietrich, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Charlie Shrem. Related case(s): No (Dietrich, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Roger Tichenor. (CTR)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by George Bachiashvili. (Bonderud, Andrew)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charlie Shrem, Roger Tichenor with Jury Demand. filed by George Bachiashvili. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - White Paper, #2 Exhibit 2 - SAFT)(Bonderud, Andrew)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2): -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GSO)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Jason Bonayer (Bonderud, Andrew)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and NOTICE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 1.08. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/5/2021. (BK)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-1529- SDM-SPF. (SJB)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18404456) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - White Paper, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bonderud, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonayer et al v. Crowd Machine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowd Machine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metavine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Pfluger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Gorlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowd Machine SEZC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Shrem
Represented By: Daniel Paul Dietrich
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Edward Klein
Represented By: Jounice Laverne Nealy-Brown
Represented By: Kevin Michael Casey
Represented By: Teresa Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitrexx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Sproule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Tichenor
Represented By: Meghan O. Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitbtc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Bonayer
Represented By: Andrew Michael Bonderud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Bachiashvili
Represented By: Andrew Michael Bonderud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?