Aviram et al v. The Bank of New York, Inc.
Plaintiff: JACARANDA, LLC, as Trustee of the 1427 Emerald Hill Way Land Trust, SUZANNE EATON, MARK EATON, KENNETH KAYE, Jimmy Aviram, Albert Wilson, CENTURION SYSTEMS, LLC, a New Mexico Limited Liability Company, as Trustee of the 2381 Bridgewood Trail Land Trust, INLAND ASSETS, LLC, as Trustee of the 7724 U.S. Open Loop Land Trust, BCP MANAGEMENT, LLC, as Trustee of the 2778 Wyndham Way Land Trust, CENTURION SYSTEMS, LLC, a New Mexico Limited Liability Company, as Successor Trustee under the 6280 30th Avenue North Land Trust, INLAND ASSETS, LLC, as Trustee of the 8101 Lake Serene Drive Land Trust, ABPAYMAR, LLC, as Trustee of the 8523 Crescent Moon Drive Land Trust, BONAFIDE PROPERTIES, LLC, as Trustee under the 6733 Breezy Palm Drive Land Trust Dated the 30 Day of April, 2014, GOSSAMER WING, LLC, as Trustee, AVA LOFGREN f/k/a NICHOLAS LOFGREN; MDTR, LLC, as Trustee of the 9937 Sago Point Drive Land Trust, ABPAYMAR, LLC, as Trustee of the 1944 Woodcut Drive Land Trust, JUDITH COOK, ABPAYMAR, LLC, as Trustee of the 3535 Heron Drive Land Trust, Wallace Cook, KRISTINE KAYE, JACARANDA, LLC, as Trustee of the 5817 Peach Heather Trail Land Trust, Ava Lofgren, Centurion Systems, LLC, BCP Management, LLC, Gossamer Wing, LLC, Inland Assets, LLC, Jacaranda, LLC, Nicholas Lofgren, Abpaymar, LLC and Bonafide Properties, LLC
Defendant: The Bank of New York, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv01608
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Law filed by Abpaymar, LLC(as Trustee of the 3535 Heron Drive Land Trust), Abpaymar, LLC(as Trustee of the 8523 Crescent Moon Drive Land Trust ), Abpaymar, LLC(as Trustee of the 1944 Woodcut Drive Land Trust ), Jimmy Aviram, BCP Management, LLC, Bonafide Properties, LLC, Centurion Systems, LLC(a New Mexico Limited Liability Company, as Successor Trustee under the 6280 30th Avenue North Land Trust ), Centurion Systems, LLC(a New Mexico Limited Liability Company, as Trustee of the 2381 Bridgewood Trail Land Trust ), Judith Cook, Wallace Cook, Mark Eaton, Suzanne Eaton, Gossamer Wing, LLC, Inland Assets, LLC(as Trustee of the 7724 U.S. Open Loop Land Trust ), Inland Assets, LLC(as Trustee of the 8101 Lake Serene Drive Land Trust ), Jacaranda, LLC( as Trustee of the 1427 Emerald Hill Way Land Trust ), Jacaranda, LLC(as Trustee of the 5817 Peach Heather Trail Land Trust ), Kenneth Kaye, Kristine Kaye, Ava Lofgren, Albert Wilson. (Segal, Lee)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal , #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by The Bank of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brochin, Robert)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction by Abpaymar, LLC(as Trustee of the 3535 Heron Drive Land Trust), Abpaymar, LLC(as Trustee of the 8523 Crescent Moon Drive Land Trust ), Abpaymar, LLC(as Trustee of the 1944 Woodcut Drive Land Trust ), Jimmy Aviram, BCP Management, LLC, Bonafide Properties, LLC, Centurion Systems, LLC(a New Mexico Limited Liability Company, as Successor Trustee under the 6280 30th Avenue North Land Trust ), Centurion Systems, LLC(a New Mexico Limited Liability Company, as Trustee of the 2381 Bridgewood Trail Land Trust ), Judith Cook, Wallace Cook, Mark Eaton, Suzanne Eaton, Gossamer Wing, LLC, Inland Assets, LLC(as Trustee of the 7724 U.S. Open Loop Land Trust ), Inland Assets, LLC(as Trustee of the 8101 Lake Serene Drive Land Trust ), Jacaranda, LLC( as Trustee of the 1427 Emerald Hill Way Land Trust ), Jacaranda, LLC(as Trustee of the 5817 Peach Heather Trail Land Trust ), Kenneth Kaye, Kristine Kaye, Ava Lofgren, Albert Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Segal, Lee)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Segal, Lee)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Segal, Lee)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GSO)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Law by The Bank of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brochin, Robert)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by The Bank of New York, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Brochin, Robert)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4--motion for an extension of time; extending through 7/19/2021 the time within which The Bank of New York, Inc., must respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/8/2021. (BK)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2): -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GSO)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal /Complaint by The Bank of New York, Inc.. (Brochin, Robert)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and NOTICE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 1.08. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/5/2021. (BK)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-1608-SDM-AEP. (LRB)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Circuit Court in and for Pinellas County, FL, case number 21-002653-CI filed in State Court on 05/28/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18436851 filed by The Bank of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 State Court COMPLAINT Ex. D, #5 State Court Other Documents Ex. E, #6 State Court Other Documents State Notice of Removal, #7 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brochin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviram et al v. The Bank of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACARANDA, LLC, as Trustee of the 1427 Emerald Hill Way Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE EATON
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK EATON
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH KAYE
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Aviram
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Wilson
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTURION SYSTEMS, LLC, a New Mexico Limited Liability Company, as Trustee of the 2381 Bridgewood Trail Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INLAND ASSETS, LLC, as Trustee of the 7724 U.S. Open Loop Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCP MANAGEMENT, LLC, as Trustee of the 2778 Wyndham Way Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTURION SYSTEMS, LLC, a New Mexico Limited Liability Company, as Successor Trustee under the 6280 30th Avenue North Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INLAND ASSETS, LLC, as Trustee of the 8101 Lake Serene Drive Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABPAYMAR, LLC, as Trustee of the 8523 Crescent Moon Drive Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONAFIDE PROPERTIES, LLC, as Trustee under the 6733 Breezy Palm Drive Land Trust Dated the 30 Day of April, 2014
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOSSAMER WING, LLC, as Trustee
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVA LOFGREN f/k/a NICHOLAS LOFGREN; MDTR, LLC, as Trustee of the 9937 Sago Point Drive Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABPAYMAR, LLC, as Trustee of the 1944 Woodcut Drive Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH COOK
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABPAYMAR, LLC, as Trustee of the 3535 Heron Drive Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace Cook
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTINE KAYE
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACARANDA, LLC, as Trustee of the 5817 Peach Heather Trail Land Trust
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ava Lofgren
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centurion Systems, LLC
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCP Management, LLC
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gossamer Wing, LLC
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inland Assets, LLC
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacaranda, LLC
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Lofgren
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abpaymar, LLC
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonafide Properties, LLC
Represented By: Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Brochin
Represented By: Javier Alexander Roldan Cora
Represented By: Matthew Michael Papkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?