Lavoie v. Harper et al
Plaintiff: Agnes Lavoie and Jacqueline Cayca Candia Lavoie
Defendant: Jennifer L. Harper, PREMIER COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE GROUP, INC., Premier Community Healthcare Group and United States of America
Not Classified By Court: Len Milcowitz
Case Number: 8:2021cv01663
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/2/2021. (TWL)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #13), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/2/2021. (TWL)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington Bench Trial set for the February 2023 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/22/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/2/2021. (TWL)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Agnes Lavoie. (Clark, James)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Leuthauser, Stephanie)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jennifer L. Harper, Premier Community Healthcare Group, United States of America. (Pettis, Yohance)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by United States of America.(Pettis, Yohance)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint and file a Case Management Report. (Doc. #7). Response to complaint due August 23, 2021. Case Management Report due August 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/19/2021. (DMD)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Pettis, Yohance)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion to dismiss Defendants and substitute the United States of America as defendant. (Doc. #5). Defendants Jennifer L. Harper and Premier Community Healthcare Group are dismissed as parties and the United States of America is substituted as the proper defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/16/2021. (DMD)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party and to Dismiss Parties by All Defendants. (Pettis, Yohance)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by July 23, 2021, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/9/2021. (DMD)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-1663-VMC-TGW. (SJB)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pasco Circuit Court, case number 2021-CV-1107 filed in State Court on 5/12/2021. filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Declaration, #3 Scoping Approval, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leuthauser, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavoie v. Harper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Lavoie
Represented By: Armando T. Lauritano
Represented By: James D. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Cayca Candia Lavoie
Represented By: Armando T. Lauritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L. Harper
Represented By: Stephanie Smith Leuthauser
Represented By: Yohance Asim Pettis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Smith Leuthauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Community Healthcare Group
Represented By: Yohance Asim Pettis
Represented By: Stephanie Smith Leuthauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Yohance Asim Pettis
Represented By: Stephanie Smith Leuthauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Len Milcowitz
Represented By: Leonard Milcowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?