Tarverdiyeva v. Coinbase Global, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rahila Tarverdiyeva
Defendant: Coinbase Global, Inc. and Coinbase
Case Number: 8:2021cv01717
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Deceptive Trade Practices
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER of USCA: Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellee Coinbase Global, Inc. is GRANTED as to #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Rahila Tarverdiyeva. EOD: 3/22/22; USCA number: 21-13354-CC. (JNB)
January 21, 2022 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #15 Notice of Appeal. All documents are imaged and available for the USCA to retrieve electronically. USCA number: 21-13354-CC (LD)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING #14 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/9/2021. (JRF)
October 7, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion by Rahila Tarverdiyeva. (LD)
September 30, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Reconsideration re #13 Order on Motion to CompelOrder on Motion for Leave to File Document Defendant Coinbase, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration filed by Coinbase Global, Inc.. (Reagan, Amanda)
September 30, 2021 Filing 16 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #15 Notice of Appeal. (LD)
September 30, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order on Motion to CompelOrder on Motion for Leave to File Document by Rahila Tarverdiyeva. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number TPA64936. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proof of Service to Court of Appeals)(LD)
September 17, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re #13 Order on Motion to CompelOrder on Motion for Leave to File Document by Rahila Tarverdiyeva. (LD)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #5 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action; DENYING AS MOOT #9 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit her claims in this action to arbitration in accordance with arbitration clauses in the User Agreement. This case is STAYED pending completion of arbitration. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE all motions pending before the Court and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The Parties shall have fourteen (14) days after the completion of arbitration to file a notice or appropriate motion advising the Court how and whether this case should proceed. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/8/2021. (JRF)
September 2, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action , #9 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by Rahila Tarverdiyeva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LD)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re #10 Response to motion by Rahila Tarverdiyeva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(AG)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 ADDITIONAL RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by Rahila Tarverdiyeva. (LD)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action by Coinbase Global, Inc.. (Reagan, Amanda)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by Rahila Tarverdiyeva. (LD)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Coinbase Global, Inc.. (Reagan, Amanda)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Carter McPherson-Evans re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action by Coinbase Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Reagan, Amanda)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action by Coinbase Global, Inc.. (Reagan, Amanda) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Rahila Tarverdiyeva. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Coinbase Global, Inc. (JLD)
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coinbase Global, Inc. with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number TPA064352 filed by Rahila Tarverdiyeva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(JLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarverdiyeva v. Coinbase Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coinbase Global, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coinbase
Represented By: Amanda Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahila Tarverdiyeva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?