Bioserenity Incorporated v. Blackstone Medical Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Bioserenity Incorporated
Defendant: Blackstone Medical Services, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Gregory P. Holder
Case Number: 8:2021cv01736
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
2 Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Defend Trade Secrets Act (of 2016)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 31 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:21-cv-01736-WFJ-MRM. Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson no longer assigned to the case. (SAO)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Motion to Amend CMSO as follows: Plaintiff expert disclosure is due 7/8/2022; Defendant expert disclosure is due 8/8/2022; Rebuttal expert disclosure is due 8/29/2022; Discovery cut-off is 9/30/2022; and Dispositive motion filing deadline is 11/2/2022. Mediator selection/scheduling due by 9/3/2022. Conduct mediation by 10/3/2022. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/16/2022. (CCB)
March 16, 2022 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Amend #24 Case Management / Scheduling Order, 26 Order on Motion to Amend by Bioserenity Incorporated. (Turner, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2022 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/30/2022; Dispositive motions due by 11/2/2022. (CCB)
March 11, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Francis McCabe on behalf of Blackstone Medical Services, LLC. (McCabe, Kyle)
December 23, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The final pretrial conference previously scheduled for 12/2/2022 and jury trial previously scheduled for the term beginning 1/3/2023 are rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2023 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial set for the April 2023 trial term commencing 4/3/2023 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. The final pretrial statement is due 3/2/2023.(CCB)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Motion to Amend the Case Management and Scheduling Order as follows: Plaintiff expert disclosure is 4/4/2022; Defendant expert disclosure is 5/3/2022; Rebuttal expert disclosure is 5/24/2022; Discovery cut-off is 7/1/2022; Mediation selection/scheduling due 7/5/2022; Conduct Mediation by 8/2/2022; and Dispositive motion filing deadline is 9/1/2022. Pretrial and trial to be set by separate notice. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/23/2021. (CCB)
December 23, 2021 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Amend #24 Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order by All Plaintiffs. (Turner, Elizabeth)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 6/1/2022. Pretrial statement due by 12/1/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial set for the January 2023 Trial Term commencing 1/3/2023 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/2/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/6/2021. (CAH)
September 28, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #21 Amended Complaint by Blackstone Medical Services, LLC.(Koenig, Eric)
September 28, 2021 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Turner, Elizabeth)
September 14, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blackstone Medical Services, LLC filed by Bioserenity Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Turner, Elizabeth)
September 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Elizabeth Bulat Turner on behalf of Bioserenity Incorporated. Lead Counsel: Elizabeth Bulat Turner. (Turner, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 plaintiff's Motion for Matthew D. Treco to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 plaintiff's Motion for Elizabeth Bulat Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/13/2021. (DMS)
September 10, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Blackstone Medical Services, LLC. (Koenig, Eric)
September 2, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Elizabeth Bulat Turner to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18666088 for $150 by Bioserenity Incorporated. (Lang, Chad) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 2, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew D. Treco to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18666083 for $150 by Bioserenity Incorporated. (Lang, Chad) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 31, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE to counsel Elizabeth Bulat Turner; Matthew Dempsey Treco and Chad K. Lang of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE to counsel Elizabeth Bulat Turner and Matthew Dempsey Treco re: Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Blackstone Medical Services, LLC.(Koenig, Eric)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint on or before 8/24/2021. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/16/2021. (CCB)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Blackstone Medical Services, LLC. (Koenig, Eric)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on July 27, 2021 by Bioserenity Incorporated as to Blackstone Medical Services, LLC. (Lang, Chad)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SAO)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SAO)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Blackstone Medical Services, LLC. (LNR)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Bioserenity Incorporated. (Lang, Chad)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER appointing Gregory P. Holder as mediator in this action. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/20/2021. (CCB)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-1736-WFJ-TGW. (SJB)
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bioserenity Incorporated. (Lang, Chad)
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Blackstone Medical Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18486920) filed by Bioserenity Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Confidentiality and Non-Disclosure Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Order)(Lang, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bioserenity Incorporated v. Blackstone Medical Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bioserenity Incorporated
Represented By: Chad K. Lang
Represented By: Elizabeth Bulat Turner
Represented By: Matthew D. Treco
Represented By: Matthew Dempsey Treco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Medical Services, LLC
Represented By: Eric S. Koenig
Represented By: Kyle Francis McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gregory P. Holder
Represented By: Gregory P. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?