SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC v. Bierman et al
Plaintiff: SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC
Defendant: Richard Bradley Bierman, M/Y Alley Cat, Brad Bierman and Richard B. Bierman
In Re: M/Y Alley Cat, a 2007 Model 39-foot Meridian Yachts Cruiser bearing Hull Identification Number MDNH6008F607, and U.S. Coast Official Number 1202587, her engines, tackle, furniture, tender and appu.
Case Number: 8:2021cv01854
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 31301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC as to Richard Bradley Bierman. (Stroup, James)
September 7, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Publication of notice of the arrest of M/Y Alley Cat by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Stroup, James) Modified on 9/8/2021 to edit text (CRH).
August 20, 2021 Filing 22 US Marshal 285 form re: Warrant of Arrest in Rem executed 8/19/2021. (ABC)
August 11, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Process of Attachment and Garnishment. (CRH)
August 11, 2021 Filing 20 ENTERED IN ERROR (JMF) Modified on 8/12/2021 to edit text (CRH).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appoint Custodian. SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC is appointed as Substitute Custodian. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/11/2021. (JMF)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Process of Attachment and Writ of Garnishment. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/10/2021. (JMF)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Abstract of Title by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Abstract of Title)(Stroup, James) Modified on 8/10/2021 to edit text (CRH).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Issuance of Warrant In Rem. The Clerk is directed to issue a Warrant of Arrest in the above-styled action for the arrest of the M/Y Alley Cat, Official Number 1202587, in rem, forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 8/9/2021. (JMF)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Process of Attachment. by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stroup, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant In Rem by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Directing Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest in rem, #2 Exhibit - Warrant of Arrest in rem for M/Y Alley Cat)(Stroup, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffery A. Durning re: #10 MOTION to Appoint Custodian SHM Regatta Pointe by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stroup, James)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT and indemnification agreement for appointment of substitute custodian. (Stroup, James)
August 6, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Custodian SHM Regatta Pointe by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC. (Stroup, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC. Related case(s): No (Stroup, James)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by James W. Stroup on behalf of SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC. Lead Counsel: James W. Stroup. (Stroup, James)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRH)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report within forty days after any defendant appears. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/4/2021. (DMP)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sun Communities, Inc., Other Affiliate Sun Communities Operating Limited Partnership for SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC.. (Stroup, James)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Executed Sworn Declaration of James W. Stroup by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stroup, James) Modified on 8/5/2021 to edit text (CRH).
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Richard Bradley Bierman. (CRH)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn K. Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-1854-KKM-AEP. (SJB)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18544119) filed by SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Stroup, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC v. Bierman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Bradley Bierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y Alley Cat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Bierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Bierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHM Regatta Pointe, LLC
Represented By: James W. Stroup
Represented By: Farris J. Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: M/Y Alley Cat, a 2007 Model 39-foot Meridian Yachts Cruiser bearing Hull Identification Number MDNH6008F607, and U.S. Coast Official Number 1202587, her engines, tackle, furniture, tender and appu.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?