Vereen v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Ernest Vereen, Jr.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2021cv01883
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court, having reviewed Ernest Vereen's latest submission (Doc. #7), hereby directs the Clerk to send Mr. Vereen a copy of this Order and the government's August 20, 2021 response in opposition. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/6/2021. (SGM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to request this Court to lawfully overturn his case due to Respondent not timely responding to Court Order by September 10th, 2021 by Ernest Vereen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(ABC)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:15-cr-474-VMC-JSS filed by Ernest Vereen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(ABC)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:15-cr-474-VMC-JSS filed by United States of America. (Adams, Natalie)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 Entered in Error - duplicate of entry no. #4) SUPPLEMENT re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:15-cr-474-VMC-JSS by Ernest Vereen, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(ABC) Modified text on 8/25/2021 (AG).
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:15-cr-474-VMC-JSS by Ernest Vereen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(ABC)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the United States of America to respond to the motion to vacate. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/10/2021. (SGM)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:15-cr-474-VMC-JSS filed by Ernest Vereen, Jr.(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vereen v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Vereen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Natalie Hirt Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?