Fard v. United States of America
Petitioner: Akbar Ghaneh Fard
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2021cv02049
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting the government's motion for extension. (Doc. #6). The government's response is now due November 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/24/2021. (DMD)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States of America. (Chee, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR. Modified text on 9/14/2021 (LNR).
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of substitution of AUSA. David W.A. Chee substituting for Thomas N. Palermo. (Chee, David)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the United States of America to respond to the motion to vacate. Response due by September 27, 2021. Petitioner may have 25 days to reply to the response. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/27/2021. (DMD)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Motion to Vacate / Set Aside / Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Akbar Ghaneh Fard. (LNR)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:17-cr-00131-VMC-SPF filed by Akbar Ghaneh Fard.(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fard v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Akbar Ghaneh Fard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Nelson Palermo
Represented By: Suzanne C. Nebesky
Represented By: David W.A. Chee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?