Debose v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Angela Debose and Angela W. DeBose
Defendant: United States, Thirteenth Judicial State Court, Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Ronald Ficarrotta, Elizabeth G. Rice, Gregory P. Holder, James M Barton, University of South Florida Board of Trustees, Ralph Wilcox, Paul Dosal, Gerard Solis, Lois Palmer, Greenberg Traurig, P.A. and Richard McCrea
Case Number: 8:2021cv02127
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
2 Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 28 PROOF of service by Angela W. DeBose (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service of Process)(DeBose, Angela)
November 3, 2021 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Angela W. DeBose.(DeBose, Angela)
November 2, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Angela W. DeBose. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibits (17-CA-1652), #3 Exhibit Exhibits (19-CA-4473))(DeBose, Angela)
November 1, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of compliance re #22 MOTION to Quash Improper Service of Process on Behalf of Gregory Holder re Rule 3.01(g) by Gregory P. Holder (Rollins, Ivy)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17--motion for leave to amend the complaint; granting #21--motion for an extension of time. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/29/2021. (GG)
October 29, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Anisha P. Patel on behalf of Greenberg Traurig, P.A. (Patel, Anisha)
October 28, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Quash Improper Service of Process on Behalf of Gregory Holder by Gregory P. Holder. (Rollins, Ivy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 28, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Amended Complaint by James M Barton, Paul Dosal, Ronald Ficarrotta, Lois Palmer, Elizabeth G. Rice, Gerard Solis, Thirteenth Judicial State Court, University of South Florida Board of Trustees, Ralph Wilcox. (Rollins, Ivy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivy Pereira Rollins on behalf of James M Barton, Paul Dosal, Ronald Ficarrotta, Gregory P. Holder, Lois Palmer, Elizabeth G. Rice, Gerard Solis, Thirteenth Judicial State Court, University of South Florida Board of Trustees, Ralph Wilcox (Rollins, Ivy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Parker Waggoner on behalf of Greenberg Traurig, P.A., Richard McCrea (Waggoner, Dennis)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Greenberg Traurig, P.A., Richard McCrea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Webb, Joshua)
October 12, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend #11 Amended Complaint by Angela W. DeBose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CTR)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER striking #13--unauthorized second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/5/2021. (GG)
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to Paul Dosal, Gregory P. Holder, Richard McCrea, Lois Palmer, Gerard Solis, Ralph Wilcox. (CTR)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to James M Barton, Ronald Ficarrotta, Greenberg Traurig, P.A., Elizabeth G. Rice, Thirteenth Judicial State Court, United States, University of South Florida Board of Trustees. (CTR)
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER #16***SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thirteenth Judicial State Court, United States, Ronald Ficarrotta, Elizabeth G. Rice, Gregory P. Holder, James M Barton, University of South Florida Board of Trustees, Ralph Wilcox, Paul Dosal, Gerard Solis, Lois Palmer, Greenberg Traurig, P.A., Richard McCrea with Jury Demand. filed by Angela Debose. Related document: #11 Amended Complaint filed by Angela Debose.(CTR) Modified on 10/5/2021 (CTR).
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7--motion to file electronically; denying as moot #8--motion to correct a clerical mistake; rejecting #9--notice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/21/2021. (GG)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thirteenth Judicial State Court, United States with Jury Demand. filed by Angela Debose.(MCB)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing of Amended Complaint by Angela Debose (MCB)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing the Original Complaint's Clock-in Date and Time Stamp Submitted to the Clerk for Filing by Angela Debose (CTR)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Correct Clerical Error by Angela Debose. (CTR)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to File Electronically by Angela Debose. (CTR)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Angela Debose. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER striking #1--complaint; directing the plaintiff to comply with Local Rule 1.08 and amend the complaint not later than September 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/14/2021. (GG)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2127-SDM-AAS. Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of recusal. The Clerk is hereby directed to reassign this case to another magistrate judge by random draw and to provide notice to the parties of the newly designated magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/13/2021. (JMF)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER #5***COMPLAINT against Thirteenth Judicial State Court, United States with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number TPA064774 filed by Angela Debose. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR) Modified on 9/14/2021 (CTR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debose v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Debose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela W. DeBose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirteenth Judicial State Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirteenth Judicial Circuit
Represented By: Ivy Pereira Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Ficarrotta
Represented By: Ivy Pereira Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth G. Rice
Represented By: Ivy Pereira Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory P. Holder
Represented By: Ivy Pereira Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Barton
Represented By: Ivy Pereira Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of South Florida Board of Trustees
Represented By: Ivy Pereira Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Wilcox
Represented By: Ivy Pereira Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dosal
Represented By: Ivy Pereira Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Solis
Represented By: Ivy Pereira Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Palmer
Represented By: Ivy Pereira Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenberg Traurig, P.A.
Represented By: Anisha P. Patel
Represented By: Joshua C. Webb
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McCrea
Represented By: Anisha P. Patel
Represented By: Joshua C. Webb
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?