Caliber Home Loans, Inc. v. Florida Intra State Title, LLC
Plaintiff: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Defendant: Florida Intra State Title, LLC dba Sunset Title Services, Chicago Title Insurance Company, John Does 1-10 and Florida Intra State Title, LLC doing business as Sunset Title Services
Case Number: 8:2021cv02140
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #19). Defendant Florida Intra State Title's response now due November 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/4/2021. (DMD)
November 4, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Florida Intra State Title, LLC. (Soto, Nicole)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #15). Defendant Chicago Title's response now due November 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/4/2021. (DMD)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Taira Salahutdin on behalf of Florida Intra State Title, LLC (Salahutdin, Taira)
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Farinas Soto on behalf of Florida Intra State Title, LLC (Soto, Nicole)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Feather, Scott)
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Scott D. Feather on behalf of Chicago Title Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Scott D. Feather. (Feather, Scott)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Robert Christopher Folland on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Lead Counsel: Robert C. Folland. (Folland, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Chicago Title Insurance Company. Related case(s): No. (Feather, Scott) Modified text on 10/5/2021 (LNR).
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Chicago Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Finance, Inc. for Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Feather, Scott)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Feather on behalf of Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Feather, Scott)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Smart on behalf of Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Smart, Christopher)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 9/24/2021 by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. as to Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Folland, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Folland, Robert)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Florida Intra State Title, LLC. (LNR)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by November 15, 2021, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/9/2021. (DMD)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/09/2021 by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. as to Florida Intra State Title, LLC. (Folland, Robert)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-2140-VMC-JSS. (SJB)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # AFLMDC-18676854) filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons - Florida Intra State Title, LLC, #10 Proposed Summons - Chicago Title Insurance Company, #11 Proposed Summons - Chicago Title Insurance Company CFO)(Folland, Robert) Modified on 9/8/2021 to correct docket text(SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caliber Home Loans, Inc. v. Florida Intra State Title, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Christopher Folland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Intra State Title, LLC dba Sunset Title Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott D. Feather
Represented By: Christopher W. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Intra State Title, LLC doing business as Sunset Title Services
Represented By: Nicole Farinas Soto
Represented By: Taira Salahutdin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?