AIG Property Casualty Company v. Omega Flex, Inc.
Plaintiff: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY, and AIG Property Casualty Company
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv02202
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer. The deadline to amend pleadings is December 27, 2021. Doc. 13 at 2. Because AIG consents to Omega Flex's requested amendment, Omega Flex may amend. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Nonetheless, to the extent that Omega Flex seeks leave from the Court "[i]n an abundance of caution," the Court grants Omega Flex leave to file an amended answer. Omega Flex must file its amended answer and affirmative defenses on the docket as a separate docket entry on or before November 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/12/2021. (GLP)
November 12, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER by Omega Flex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schindler, Andrew)
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE (BGS)
November 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Peaire, Matthew)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Pamela Perry as mediator by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Peaire, Matthew)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/6/2023, Dispositive motions due by 2/3/2023, Pretrial statement due by 5/23/2023, All other motions due by 5/30/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2023 at 1:15 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 7/3/2023 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/3/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/21/2021. (BGS)
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Peaire, Matthew)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Omega Flex, Inc. (Schindler, Andrew) Modified on 9/21/2021 to edit text (CRK).
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Omega Flex, Inc.(Schindler, Andrew) Modified on 9/21/2021 to edit text (CRK).
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule 3.03 by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Peaire, Matthew)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by AIG Property Casualty Company. Related case(s): Yes (Peaire, Matthew)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew Weston Peaire on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company. Lead Counsel: MATTHEW W. PEAIRE. (Peaire, Matthew)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Matthew Weston Peaire of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in and For Pinellas County, Florida, case number 21-003907-CI filed in State Court on 8/19/2021. filed by Omega Flex, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents)(Schindler, Andrew)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-2202-CEH-AEP. (SJB)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Cout of the Fourth Judicial Cicuirt in and For Duval County, Florida, case number 2019-CA8584 filed in State Court on 12/03/2019. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18715796 filed by Omega Flex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schindler, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIG Property Casualty Company v. Omega Flex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Matthew Weston Peaire
Represented By: Joshua Ross Goodman
Represented By: Thomas Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew R. Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?