Reiner v. Standard Mfg. Co., LLC
Plaintiff: Sandra Reiner
Defendant: Standard Mfg. Co., LLC
Not Classified By Court: Gregory P. Holder
Case Number: 8:2021cv02270
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Standard Mfg. Co., LLC. (George, Edward)
November 12, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sandra Reiner. (Hubbard, Robert)
November 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clayton Hubbard on behalf of Sandra Reiner. (Hubbard, Robert)
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by George A. Vaka on behalf of Sandra Reiner. (Vaka, George)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/8/2021. (TWL)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #12), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/8/2021. (TWL)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington Jury Trial set for the February 2023 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/2/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/5/2021. (TWL)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (George, Edward)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jeffrey M. Malsch may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/12/2021. (SFC)
October 12, 2021 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. BFLMDC-18803796 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M. Malsch. (George, Edward)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION for Jeffrey M. Malsch to appear pro hac vice by Standard Mfg. Co., LLC. (George, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward Taylor George on behalf of Standard Mfg. Co., LLC. Lead Counsel: E. Taylor George. (George, Edward)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Standard Mfg. Co., LLC. (George, Edward)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Standard Mfg. Co., LLC.(George, Edward)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Jeffrey Malsch Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABC)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Taylor George, and Kerry A. McKeown of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABC)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by October 18, 2021, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/27/2021. (SGM)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2270-VMC-AAS. (SJB)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit, case number 2021CA001879CAAXES filed in State Court on August 11, 2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18749279 filed by Standard Mfg. Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(George, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reiner v. Standard Mfg. Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Reiner
Represented By: Desiree M. Zornow
Represented By: George A. Vaka
Represented By: Robert Clayton Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Mfg. Co., LLC
Represented By: Edward Taylor George
Represented By: Jeffrey Malsch
Represented By: Kerry McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gregory P. Holder
Represented By: Gregory P. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?