Ingram v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lindsay Ingram
Defendant: Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2021cv02274
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Lindsay Ingram (Schmoyer, Marjorie)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Lindsay Ingram (Schmoyer, Marjorie)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Lindsay Ingram. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/14/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schmoyer, Marjorie)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ABC)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (ABC)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Lindsay Ingram's #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis/Affidavit of Indigency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/28/2021. (AMS)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:21-cv-2274-WFJ-CPT. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (LMW)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Lindsay Ingram. (Schmoyer, Marjorie)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acting Commissioner of Social Security filed by Lindsay Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmoyer, Marjorie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Ingram
Represented By: Marjorie Anne Schmoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?