Stumphauzer v. Scaramellino
Plaintiff: Ryan K. Stumphauzer, as Court-Appointed Receiver for Eagle Six Consultants, Inc. and Ryan K. Stumphauzer
Defendant: Daniel Scaramellino
Case Number: 8:2021cv02307
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery by Ryan K. Stumphauzer. (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum Law filed by Ryan K. Stumphauzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jessica Albert)(Kolaya, Timothy)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum Law by Daniel Scaramellino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Affidavit of Daniel Scaramellino)(Hinton, Katie)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Brinson Hinton on behalf of Daniel Scaramellino (Hinton, Katie)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ryan K. Stumphauzer. Related case(s): Yes (Kolaya, Timothy)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Daniel Scaramellino. (CTR)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2307-SDM-AAS. (SJB)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ryan K. Stumphauzer, as Court-Appointed Receiver for Eagle Six Consultants, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Eagle Six Consultants, Inc. for Ryan K. Stumphauzer, as Court-Appointed Receiver for Eagle Six Consultants, Inc.. (Kolaya, Timothy)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Scaramellino (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18763110) filed by Ryan K. Stumphauzer, as Court-Appointed Receiver for Eagle Six Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Receivership Orders, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Lifting Stay of Litigation, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Secured Convertible Line of Credit Note, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email from D. Scaramellino to J. LaForte, #6 Exhibit 6 - Ledger of Scaramellino Acount, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Kolaya, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stumphauzer v. Scaramellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan K. Stumphauzer, as Court-Appointed Receiver for Eagle Six Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan K. Stumphauzer
Represented By: Jessica P Albert
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Scaramellino
Represented By: Katie Brinson Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?