Eddy v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kimberly Eddy
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2021cv02346
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Kimberly Eddy. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/1/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (LD)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF of service as to Regional Chief Counsel by Kimberly Eddy (LD)
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service as to United States Attorney General by Kimberly Eddy (LD)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Elder, Nadine)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (TDC)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/7/2021. (CKR)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (LD)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kimberly Eddy. (LD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Kimberly Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eddy v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Eddy
Represented By: Stephan John Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?