Baron et al v. Syniverse Corporation
Plaintiff: Melissa Baron, Olivia Enloe, John Pels, Marco Lerra, Alexis Mullen, Nicholas Yeomelakis and Thomas Macnish
Defendant: Syniverse Corporation
Case Number: 8:2021cv02349
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1711
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated) against Syniverse Corporation with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Yanchunis, John)
December 1, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason H. Baruch on behalf of Syniverse Corporation. Lead Counsel: Jason H. Baruch. (Baruch, Jason)
November 30, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kevin Bruce Love on behalf of Thomas Macnish, Alexis Mullen. Lead Counsel: Linda Nussbaum. (Love, Kevin)
November 30, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE to counsel Kevin Bruce Love, Linda Phyllis Nussbaum, Lindsey Caryn Grossman, Michael E. Criden, Anthony J. Palermo, Jason H. Baruch of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Sarah Kramer on behalf of Syniverse Corporation (Kramer, Jessica)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases; consolidating Case No. 8:21-cv-2363-SCB-SPF with Case No. 8:21-cv-2349-SCB-SPF; directing that all further pleadings be filed in Lead Case No. 8:21-cv-2349-SCB-SPF; directing the Clerk to administratively close Case No. 8:21-cv-2363-SCB-SPF; directing Plaintiffs to file a single amended complaint by 12/3/2021; directing Defendant to file its response to the amended complaint by 1/18/2022; and directing Plaintiffs to file any response thereto by 3/2/2022. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 11/24/2021. (SLB)
November 23, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by All Plaintiffs. (Yanchunis, John)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due 12/3/2021. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 10/28/2021. (SLB)
October 28, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Syniverse Corporation. (Palermo, Anthony)
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason H. Baruch on behalf of Syniverse Corporation (Baruch, Jason)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Amended Motion for Steven M. Nathan to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Amended Motion for James P. Pizzirusso to Appear Pro Hac Vice; directing attorneys Nathan and Pizzirusso to submit the Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 10/13/2021. (SLB)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 Amended MOTION for James P. Pizzirusso to appear pro hac vice by Melissa Baron, Olivia Enloe, Marco Lerra, John Pels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yanchunis, John)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Steven M. Nathan to appear pro hac vice by Melissa Baron, Olivia Enloe, Marco Lerra, John Pels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yanchunis, John)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c) (effective Feb. 1, 2021); denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c) (effective Feb. 1, 2021). Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 10/8/2021. (SLB)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Syniverse Corporation. (LSS)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Steven M. Nathan to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18793707 for $150 by Melissa Baron, Olivia Enloe, Marco Lerra, John Pels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yanchunis, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for James P. Pizzirusso to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18792407 for $150 by Melissa Baron, Olivia Enloe, Marco Lerra, John Pels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yanchunis, John)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. (CAB)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Melissa Baron, Olivia Enloe, Marco Lerra, John Pels. (Yanchunis, John)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan D. Maxey on behalf of Melissa Baron, Olivia Enloe, Marco Lerra, John Pels (Maxey, Ryan)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-2349-SCB-SPF. (SJB)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Syniverse Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18784246) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yanchunis, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baron et al v. Syniverse Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Baron
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan D. Maxey
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Steven Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Enloe
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan D. Maxey
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Steven Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pels
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan D. Maxey
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Steven Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Lerra
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Steven Nathan
Represented By: Ryan D. Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Mullen
Represented By: Kevin Bruce Love
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Michael E. Criden
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Yeomelakis
Represented By: Kevin Bruce Love
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Michael E. Criden
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Macnish
Represented By: Kevin Bruce Love
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Michael E. Criden
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syniverse Corporation
Represented By: Jason H. Baruch
Represented By: Anthony J. Palermo
Represented By: Jessica Sarah Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?