Bennett et al v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG et al
Plaintiff: CDO Investments LLC, MCF Enterprises Inc, Joseph Niemiec, Christina M. Vest, Abigail Cohen, Ines Jaramillo, John Judge, Rebecca Judge, Christopher Kopach, Marie Lorquet, Vince Russo, Mark Rigopoulos, Sheri Rigopoulos, Olivia Porciuncula, Glenn Price, Julianne Kopach, Les Poricuncula, Fred Pool, Raquel DeFigueiredo, Ed Ball, Margot Gravel, Sharon Timmons, Fred Stockton, Edward Laremore, James Blevins, Ina Helmick, Byron Robbins, Fern Robbins, Anjali Van Drie, Leonard Armstrong, Maritza Pineda Jaramillo, Allstate Servicing Inc, Loretha J. Armstrong, Kenneth Butcher, Tobi Butcher, Gary Helmick, Susan Niemiec, Rose Russo and Christian Vest
Defendant: Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG, Knauf International, GMBH, Knauf Insulation GMBH, Knauf UK GmbH, Knauf AMF GmbH & Co KG, Knauf DO Brasil LTD, PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia, Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., LTD., Knauf Plasterboard (WUHU) Co. LTD and Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Co Ltd
Case Number: 8:2021cv02501
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DIRECTING the filing of individual actions. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/29/2021. (MWC)
October 29, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
October 27, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., LTD.. Lead Counsel: Kerry J. Miller, Esq.. (Kolaya, Timothy)
October 27, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., LTD. (Kolaya, Timothy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE to counsel Daniel John Dysart; Kerry James Miller and Michael Ryan Dodson of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
October 26, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE to counsel Daniel John Dysart; Kerry James Miller and Michael Ryan Dodson of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
October 26, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE to counsel James Victor Doyle, Jr. of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
October 26, 2021 Filing 28 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Alabama. Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New Case Number: 8:21-cv-2501-MSS-CPT. (AG)
October 26, 2021 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 5:14-cv-02204. File received electronically
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The Court severs and transfers certain plaintiffs, as listed in the order, to the FLSD, ALSD, FLMD, MSSD, and TXSD, DISMISSES plaintiffs, A. DSouza, B. Desjardins, N. Khan, A. Kjos, and R. Swanson, and orders plaintiffs counsel to file a fifth amended complaint within 21 days from the entry date of this order, as more fully set in order; original electronic record will be uploaded to the Clerks of Court where the parties are being transferred to within 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/22/2021. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to re #23 Order filed by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - Due to damage caused by Hurricane Ida, the Court extends the deadline for the parties to submit the proposed order referenced in the 30 Order issued on 8/30/2021 from 9/7/2021 until 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/1/2021. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - The parties are to submit an updated proposed order by 9/7/2021 which clearly and explicitly states which plaintiffs' cases are to be severed, which court those plaintiffs' cases are to be transferred to and which plaintiffs' cases are to be retained, as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/30/2021. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 22 Amended MOTION Entry of Proposed Order by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Motion for Entry of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION For Entry of Proposed Order by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/26/2021. (KBW) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/26/2021. (KBW) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2021; James Doyle present for plaintiffs; Michael Dodson and Kerry Miller present for defendants; Parties discussed current posture of the case. Parties to submit a proposed order for severance and transfer not later than May 5, 2021. (SPT ) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kerry James Miller by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel John Dysart by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
April 21, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3823378 (B4601112799). (Dodson, Michael) Modified on 4/22/2021 (AHI). [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
April 21, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-382336 (B460112798). (Dodson, Michael) Modified on 4/22/2021 (AHI). [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for Wednesday, 4/21/2021, at 2:30 p.m. CST; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/19/21. (SPT ) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Report of Mediator - Mediation was Unsuccessful by Brad Wash. filed by Brad Wash (Wash, R) Modified on 4/15/2021 (AHI). [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the deadline for the parties to conduct mediation is hereby extended to April 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 3/15/2021. (KBW) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Dodson on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd (Dodson, Michael) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Victor Doyle, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Doyle, James) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 2/4/2021; James Doyle, Jr. present for plaintiff; The Court conducted a telephone conference in this matter on February 4, 2021. As discussed during the conference, the parties hereby ordered to mediate this case within 45 days. The parties are further ordered to file a joint status report on or before March 22, 2021, regarding the results of the mediation. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (SPT ) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court conducted a telephone conference in this matter on February 4, 2021. As discussed during the conference, the parties hereby ORDERED to mediate this case within 45 days. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before March 22, 2021, regarding the results of the mediation. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/4/21. (BJL) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 2/4/2021 at 10:45 a.m.; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/01/21. (SPT ) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 DOCKET SHEET for Eastern District of Louisiana (2:14-cv-02722-EEF-MBN). (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from Eastern District of Louisiana (2:14-cv-02722-EEF-MBN). (KEK) (KEK, ). [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 Case reassigned to Judge Liles C Burke. Judge Inge P Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Eastern District of Louisiana for inclusion in MDL 2047 In re: Chinese-Manufactured Drywall Products Liability Litigation; certified copy of docket entries and documents electronically sent to transferee clerk in Eastern District of Louisiana. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eldon E. Fallon. (CTS, )12/8/14. [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Knauf Insulation GmbH. Delivered via certified mail. (PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Luciana Bado, Elizabeth Bennett, Jennifer Brady, CDO Investments LLC, Mary Sue Caranna, Damian Cason, Mardechria Charles, Bonnie Cordier, Ajesh D'Souza, Bill Desjardins, George Ferry, Stephanie Fussell, Michael Ginart, Jack Green, Tim Hoffman, Ike Ijemere, Jeremy Jordan, Noor Khan, Ashley Kjos, Paul J Kleinmann, MCF Enterprises Inc, Toni Macksey, Karen McCann, Mindy Milam, Ronald Pendelton, Peter Robinson, Jason Scott, Rusty Swanson, Laura Veira, Jinxi Zhu. (Doyle, James) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT (PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
November 14, 2014 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2286113 (NDAL Receipt No. B460105755). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Bennett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(PSM). (Doyle, James) Modified on 11/14/2014 (PSM). [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PSM) [Transferred from alnd on 10/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CDO Investments LLC
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCF Enterprises Inc
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Niemiec
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina M. Vest
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Cohen
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ines Jaramillo
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Judge
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Judge
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kopach
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Lorquet
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vince Russo
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rigopoulos
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Rigopoulos
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Porciuncula
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Price
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianne Kopach
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Poricuncula
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Pool
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel DeFigueiredo
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Ball
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margot Gravel
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Timmons
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Stockton
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Laremore
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Blevins
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Helmick
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Robbins
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fern Robbins
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjali Van Drie
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Armstrong
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Pineda Jaramillo
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Servicing Inc
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretha J. Armstrong
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Butcher
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobi Butcher
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Helmick
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Niemiec
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Russo
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Vest
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf International, GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Insulation GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf UK GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf AMF GmbH & Co KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf DO Brasil LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., LTD.
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard (WUHU) Co. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?