Colony Insurance Company v. Coastal Construction Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Defendant: Coastal Construction Management, LLC, Rosalyne Holdings, LLC, WPC III, Inc. dba Winter Park Construction Company and Ascentia Development Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv02541
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 0635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Colony's complaint [DE 1] or alternatively to stay action MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint , #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or Alternatively Stay This Action filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Darroch, Robert)
December 23, 2021 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT to Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification Regarding Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Ascentia Development Group, Inc.. (Hintson, Michele)
December 17, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ascentia Development Group, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Hintson, Michele)
December 17, 2021 Filing 23 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ascentia Development Group, Inc.. (Hintson, Michele)
December 17, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Ascentia Development Group, Inc.. (Hintson, Michele)
December 16, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele Leo Hintson on behalf of Ascentia Development Group, Inc. (Hintson, Michele)
December 10, 2021 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 11/30/21 by Colony Insurance Company as to Coastal Construction Management, LLC. (Darroch, Robert)
December 6, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by WPC III, Inc. dba Winter Park Construction Company. (Norman, Todd)
December 6, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by WPC III, Inc. dba Winter Park Construction Company. Related case(s): Yes (Norman, Todd)
December 6, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or Alternatively Stay This Action by WPC III, Inc. dba Winter Park Construction Company. (Norman, Todd)
December 6, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rosalyne Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Ellis, Bradley)
December 6, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rosalyne Holdings, LLC identifying Other Affiliate BBW Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Longboat Property Management, LLC for Rosalyne Holdings, LLC. (Ellis, Bradley)
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Colony's complaint [DE 1] or alternatively to stay action, MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by Rosalyne Holdings, LLC. (Ellis, Bradley)
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd K. Norman on behalf of WPC III, Inc. dba Winter Park Construction Company (Norman, Todd)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 11/26/2021 by Colony Insurance Company as to Ascentia Development Group, Inc.. (Darroch, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Nicholas E. Richardson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/22/2021. (BEE)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw Nicholas E. Richardson by Colony Insurance Company. (Darroch, Robert)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 11/15/2021 by Colony Insurance Company as to WPC III, Inc. dba Winter Park Construction Company. (Darroch, Robert)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 11/15/2021 by Colony Insurance Company as to Rosalyne Holdings, LLC. (Darroch, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 ***TERMINATED, COUNSEL TO REFILE AS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED*** PROOF of service by Colony Insurance Company (Darroch, Robert) Modified on 11/16/2021 (LD).
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Colony Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Darroch, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Colony Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Argonaut Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd. for Colony Insurance Company. (Darroch, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Ascentia Development Group, Inc., Coastal Construction Management, LLC, Rosalyne Holdings, LLC, WPC III, Inc. dba Winter Park Construction Company. (LD)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2541-TPB-AAS. (SJB)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18874028) filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT A - Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B1 - Policy No. 103 GL 0015769-01 (2017)_Redacted, #4 Exhibit B2 - Policy No. 103 GL 0015769-02 (2018)_Redacted, #5 Exhibit C - Letter of Understanding, #6 Exhibit D - CCM and ADG Agreement, #7 Exhibit E - ROR letter - Colony to Coastal, #8 Proposed Summons ASCENTIA DEVELOPMENT GROUP, INC., #9 Proposed Summons COASTAL CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT, #10 Proposed Summons ROSALYNE HOLDINGS, LLC, #11 Proposed Summons WPC III, Inc. dba Winter Park Construction)(Darroch, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colony Insurance Company v. Coastal Construction Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert M. Darroch
Represented By: Nicholas Edwin Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Construction Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalyne Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bradley John Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPC III, Inc. dba Winter Park Construction Company
Represented By: Todd K. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascentia Development Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michele Leo Hintson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?