Pasour v. Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tyson Pasour
Defendant: Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc., Seminole Hard Rock International LLC, Seminole Hard Rock Support Services, LLC and Seminole Hard Rock International, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Shane T. Munoz
Case Number: 8:2021cv02620
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Tyson Pasour. (Goodwin, April)
January 5, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/28/22 1:00 pm before Shane T. Munoz. (Goodwin, April)
January 5, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE by Tyson Pasour STRIKING DOCKET ENTRY 25 AND 26 (Goodwin, April)
January 5, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE by Tyson Pasour re #25 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Goodwin, April)
January 4, 2022 Filing 25 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tyson Pasour. (Goodwin, April)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER striking #23--motion for extension of time; permitting the plaintiff to amend the motion not later than 1/6/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/4/2022. (KRM)
January 3, 2022 Filing 23 (Stricken by Doc. #24) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tyson Pasour. (Goodwin, April) Modified on 1/4/2022 (KRM). Modified on 1/4/2022 (KRM).
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21--mediation order; permitting the parties to appear by video with the mediator's approval. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/29/2021. (KRM)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER appointing Shane T. Munoz as mediator; designating Andrew J. Silvers as lead counsel; directing lead counsel to coordinate the date and time of mediation and to file a notice of mediation within seven days after this order; directing the parties to mediate not later than 4/30/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/29/2021. (KRM)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final pretrial conference scheduled for 4/27/2023 at 10:00AM in Tampa Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn; jury trial scheduled for the May 2023 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/29/2021. (KRM)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #1--complaint; reminding counsel of the font requirement imposed by Local Rule 1.08. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/22/2021. (KRM)
December 17, 2021 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Schellhase, Mark)
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tyson Pasour. (Goodwin, April)
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Silvers on behalf of Tyson Pasour (Silvers, Andrew)
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc., Seminole Hard Rock International, LLC, Seminole Hard Rock Support Services, LLC. (Schellhase, Mark)
December 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Jan. 29, 2019 trespass letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - July 9, 2019 trespass letter)(Schellhase, Mark)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9--motion for extension of time; requiring the defendants to respond to the complaint not later than 12/13/21. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/30/2021. (KRM)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Lauren Pineless on behalf of Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc., Seminole Hard Rock International, LLC, Seminole Hard Rock Support Services, LLC (Pineless, Emily)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan T. Spradley on behalf of Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc., Seminole Hard Rock International, LLC, Seminole Hard Rock Support Services, LLC (Spradley, Susan)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc., Seminole Hard Rock International, LLC, Seminole Hard Rock Support Services, LLC. (Schellhase, Mark)
November 13, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/PROOF of service by Tyson Pasour (Goodwin, April) Modified on 11/15/2021 (CTR).
November 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/PROOF of service by Tyson Pasour (Goodwin, April) Modified on 11/15/2021 (CTR).
November 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/PROOF of service by Tyson Pasour (Goodwin, April) Modified on 11/15/2021 (CTR).
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS reissued with Clerk's Seal and signature as to Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc., Seminole Hard Rock International, LLC, Seminole Hard Rock Support Services, LLC. (BD) Modified on 11/10/2021 to replace with a flattened PDF and to regenerate NEF (BD).
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc., Seminole Hard Rock International, LLC, Seminole Hard Rock Support Services, LLC. (BD)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2)-Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-2620-SDM-SPF. (MLJ)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CFLMDC-18903869) filed by Tyson Pasour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons Hard Rock Support Services, #3 Proposed Summons Summons Hard Rock International, #4 Proposed Summons Summons Hard Rock Entertainment)(Goodwin, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasour v. Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Pasour
Represented By: April Goodwin
Represented By: Andrew J Silvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole Hard Rock Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Schellhase
Represented By: Emily Lauren Pineless
Represented By: Susan T. Spradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole Hard Rock International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole Hard Rock Support Services, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Schellhase
Represented By: Emily Lauren Pineless
Represented By: Susan T. Spradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole Hard Rock International, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Schellhase
Represented By: Emily Lauren Pineless
Represented By: Susan T. Spradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Shane T. Munoz
Represented By: Shane T. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?