Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Masons Live LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Masons Live LLC doing business as Masons Live, Barry G. Carew, David Fields and Kathleen M. Griner
Case Number: 8:2021cv02702
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice. After 30 days, dismissal shall be with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and to close this case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/7/2021. (EDB)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of settlement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian)
December 2, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 11-20-21 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to David Fields. (Giles, Brian)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Barry G. Carew, David Fields, Kathleen M. Griner, and Masons Live LLC. (JLD)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barry G. Carew, David Fields, Kathleen M. Griner, Masons Live LLC filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (JLD).
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon review, the Court again finds this complaint constitutes an impermissible shotgun pleading. See Weiland v. Palm Beach Cnty. Sheriff's Off., 792 F.3d 1313, 1320-23 (11th Cir. 2015). Specifically, Plaintiff does not separate the claims for satellite piracy and cable piracy into individual counts. Accordingly, the Court STRIKES Plaintiff's amended complaint. Plaintiff must file a second amended complaint complying with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by November 24, 2021, or this action will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 11/18/2021. (EDB)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order pdf by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (JLD).
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Related case(s): No (Giles, Brian) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (JLD).
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 ***STRICKEN per 5 Endorsed Order.*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barry G. Carew, David Fields, Kathleen M. Griner, Masons Live LLC filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(Giles, Brian) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (JLD).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon review, the Court finds this complaint constitutes an impermissible shotgun pleading. See Weiland v. Palm Beach Cnty. Sheriff's Off., 792 F.3d 1313, 1320-23 (11th Cir. 2015). Specifically, Plaintiff does not break every claim for relief out into individual counts. This type of pleading does not give Defendant "adequate notice of the claims against [it] and the grounds upon which each claim rests." See id. Accordingly, the Court STRIKES Plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint complying with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by November 24, 2021, or this action will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 11/17/2021. (EDB)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING CIVIL CASE ORDER. Parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within 40 days after any defendant appears. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 11/17/2021. (EDB)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:21-cv-2702-KKM-CPT. (MLJ)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barry G. Carew, David Fields, Kathleen M. Griner, Masons Live LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18936755) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Giles, Brian) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Masons Live LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masons Live LLC doing business as Masons Live
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry G. Carew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Griner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?