Pleinis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Teresa Pleinis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2021cv02724
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Teresa Pleinis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt - Attorney General)(Zadel, Bartholomew)
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Teresa Pleinis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt - Regional Chief Counsel)(Zadel, Bartholomew)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Teresa Pleinis. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/3/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt - US Attorney)(Zadel, Bartholomew)
November 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BD)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (BD)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-2724-CEH-AEP. (MLJ)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teresa Pleinis with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18948750) filed by Teresa Pleinis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #4 Proposed Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #5 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney)(Zadel, Bartholomew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pleinis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Pleinis
Represented By: Bartholomew Charles Zadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?