Armstrong et al v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Plaintiff: Leonard Armstrong and Loretha J. Armstrong
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. and Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.)
Case Number: 8:2021cv02771
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 21 Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.).(Kolaya, Timothy)
January 17, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of compliance re 17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.) (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 13, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Leonard Armstrong, Loretha J. Armstrong. (Doyle, James)
January 13, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.).(Kolaya, Timothy)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Kerry J. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Daniel J. Dysart to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Rebekka C. Veith to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Michael R. Dodson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel are directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in their CM/ECF accounts, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by 2/11/2022. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to them after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 1/11/2022. (SLB)
January 11, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Michael R. Dodson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19110520 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 11, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Rebekka C. Veith to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19110488 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 11, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel J. Dysart to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19110449 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Kerry J. Miller to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19110420 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.) identifying Corporate Parent Gebr. Knauf KG, Corporate Parent Isogranulat GmbH for Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). Lead Counsel: Kerry J. Miller. (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.) (Kolaya, Timothy)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 12/23/21 by Leonard Armstrong, Loretha J. Armstrong as to Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. (Doyle, James) Modified on 12/27/2021 (AG).
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 12/23/21 by Leonard Armstrong, Loretha J. Armstrong as to Knauf Gips KG. (Doyle, James)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Leonard Armstrong, Loretha J. Armstrong. Related case(s): Yes (Doyle, James)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. (LSS)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (CAB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2771-SCB-AAS. (SJB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. with Jury Demand filed by Leonard Armstrong, Loretha J. Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Knauf Gips KG, #3 Proposed Summons Knauf Platerboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.)(Doyle, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong et al v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Armstrong
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretha J. Armstrong
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.)
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?