Niemiec et al v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Niemiec and Susan Niemiec
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. and Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.)
Case Number: 8:2021cv02783
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 20 Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.).(Kolaya, Timothy)
January 14, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Joseph Niemiec, Susan Niemiec. (Doyle, James)
January 10, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.).(Kolaya, Timothy)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on January 7, 2022. (AKA)
January 6, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Michael R. Dodson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19094780 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
January 6, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Rebekka C. Veith to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19094776 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
January 6, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel J. Dysart to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19094692 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Kerry J. Miller to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19094677 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). Lead Counsel: Kerry J. Miller. (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 6, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.) identifying Corporate Parent Gebr. Knauf KG, Corporate Parent Gebr. Knauf KG, Corporate Parent Isogranulat GmbH, Corporate Parent Knauf Singarporte Pte Ltd., Corporate Parent Knauf International GmbH for Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.); Corporate Parent Gebr. Knauf KG, Corporate Parent Gebr. Knauf KG, Corporate Parent Isogranulat GmbH for Knauf Gips KG. (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.) (Kolaya, Timothy)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 12/20/21 by Joseph Niemiec, Susan Niemiec as to Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.. (Doyle, James)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 12/20/21 by Joseph Niemiec, Susan Niemiec as to Knauf Gips KG. (Doyle, James)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Alternative Method of Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on December 20, 2021. (AKA)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Joseph Niemiec, Susan Niemiec. Related case(s): Yes (Doyle, James)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Alternative Service by Joseph Niemiec, Susan Niemiec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Ruling by Judge Ruiz, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit of Celeste Ingalls, #3 Exhibit C: IAM News Article, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Doyle, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified event and text on 12/10/2021 (MCB).
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2)-Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. (MCB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-2783-SDM-JSS. (SJB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. with Jury Demand filed by Joseph Niemiec, Susan Niemiec. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Knauf Gips KG, #3 Proposed Summons Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.)(Doyle, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niemiec et al v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Niemiec
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Niemiec
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.)
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?