Pool et al v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Plaintiff: Fred Pool and Raquel DeFigueiredo
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. and Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.)
Case Number: 8:2021cv02785
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.).(Kolaya, Timothy)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 defendants' Unopposed Motion for Michael R. Dodson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/19/2022. (DMS)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 defendants' Unopposed Motion for Rebekka C. Veith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/19/2022. (DMS)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 defendants' Motion for Daniel J. Dysart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/19/2022. (DMS)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 defendants' Unopposed Motion for Kerry J. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/19/2022. (DMS)
January 18, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Michael R. Dodson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19132702 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 18, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Rebekka C. Veith to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19132701 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 18, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel J. Dysart to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19132700 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 18, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Kerry J. Miller to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19132699 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 18, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.) identifying Corporate Parent Gebr. Knauf KG, Corporate Parent Isogranulat GmbH, Corporate Parent Knauf Singarporte Pte Ltd., Corporate Parent Knauf International GmbH for Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.); Corporate Parent Gebr. Knauf KG, Corporate Parent Isogranulat GmbH for Knauf Gips KG. (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 18, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). Lead Counsel: Kerry J. Miller. (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd. (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.) (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 14, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Raquel DeFigueiredo, Fred Pool. (Doyle, James)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by February 9, 2022, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/6/2022. (SGM)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 01/05/22 by Fred Pool, Raquel DeFigueiredo as to Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. (Doyle, James)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 01/05/22 by Fred Pool, Raquel DeFigueiredo as to Knauf Gips KG. (Doyle, James)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Raquel DeFigueiredo, Fred Pool. Related case(s): Yes (Doyle, James)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER referring motion for report and recommendation: 5 First EXPARTE MOTION Alternative Service filed by Fred Pool, Raquel DeFigueiredo Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/14/2021. (SGM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. (LNR)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-2785-VMC-TGW. (SJB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. with Jury Demand filed by Fred Pool, Raquel DeFigueiredo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Knauf Gips KG, #3 Proposed Summons Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.)(Doyle, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pool et al v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Pool
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel DeFigueiredo
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.)
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?