Sorensen v. Saint Germain et al
Plaintiff: Laurene Sorensen
Defendant: Lisette Saint Germain and Richard L. Pearse
Case Number: 8:2021cv02905
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/5/2022, Dispositive motions due by 9/2/2022, Pretrial statement due by 12/20/2022, All other motions due by 12/27/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2023 at 3:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Bench Trial set for term commencing 2/6/2023 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/1/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/3/2022. (BGS)
February 1, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lisette Saint Germain. (Brubaker, Sara)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Defendant Lisette Saint Germain's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #15 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. Response due by 2/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/27/2022. (DK)
January 26, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Emergency Petition/Complaint Removevd by Lisette Saint Germain. (Brubaker, Sara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
January 25, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Emergency Petition/Complaint for Order Approving Sale of Real Estate filed by Laurene Sorensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rightmyer, Lee)
January 24, 2022 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Brubaker, Sara)
January 18, 2022 Filing 15 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Laurene Sorensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Baskin, Hamden) Modified text on 1/27/2022 (AG).
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 ***TERMINATED-COUNSEL ON SIGNATURE LINE DOES NOT MATCH COUNSEL OF ENTRY-COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO RE-FILE***First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Laurene Sorensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Baskin, Hamden) Modified on 1/18/2022 (CTR). Modified text on 1/27/2022 (AG).
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Emergency Petition/Complaint for Order Approving Sale of Real Estate by Lisette Saint Germain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Composite Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Brubaker, Sara)
January 5, 2022 Filing 12 ***TERMINATED***NOTICE by Laurene Sorensen (Baskin, Hamden) (CTR). Modified on 1/5/2022 (CTR).
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Laurene Sorensen. (Baskin, Hamden)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Laurene Sorensen. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Baskin, Hamden)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Answer or response due by 1/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 12/28/2021. (Flynn, Sean)
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Notice of Removal Emergency Petition / Complaint for Order Approving Sale of Real Estate (the "Complaint") (Doc No. 4-1) by Lisette Saint Germain. (Brubaker, Sara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lisette Saint Germain. Related case(s): Yes (Brubaker, Sara)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit, Pinellas County Probate Division, case number 16-008244-ES-04 filed in State Court on 12-07-2021 filed by Lisette Saint Germain. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N)(Brubaker, Sara) Modified on 12/15/2021 to correct docket text (BD).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-2905-CEH-SPF. (SJB)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lisette Saint Germain identifying Corporate Parent Richard L. Pearse, Other Affiliate Akerman LLP, Other Affiliate Hamden H. Baskin, Other Affiliate Lisette Saint Germain, Other Affiliate Richard L. Pearse, Other Affiliate Laurene Sorensen, Other Affiliate Baskin Eisel Rightmyer, Other Affiliate E Ginnette Childs, Other Affiliate Sara A. Brubaker, Other Affiliate Richard L. Pearse, Jr., PA for Lisette Saint Germain. (Brubaker, Sara) Modified on 12/15/2021 to correct docket text (BD).
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Probate Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit, in and For Pinellas County Florida, case number 16-08244-ES-04 filed in State Court on 08/02/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19031041 filed by Lisette Saint Germain. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court ANSWER, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brubaker, Sara) Modified on 12/15/2021 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorensen v. Saint Germain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurene Sorensen
Represented By: Hamden H. Baskin, III
Represented By: Lee H. Rightmyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisette Saint Germain
Represented By: Enid Ginnette Childs
Represented By: Sara Ann Brubaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Pearse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?