Estate of Mimi Adler v. Adler
Plaintiff: Estate of Mimi Adler
Defendant: James S Adler and James S. Adler
Not Classified By Court: Gregory P. Holder
Case Number: 8:2021cv02953
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Motion of Defendant James S. Adler in Lieu of Answer to Dismiss the Complaint or Stay the Action Pursuant to the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens, or in the alternative, pursuant to the FIrst-Filed Rule, and Supporting Memorandum of Law by James S. Adler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James S. Adler in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint or Stay the Action)(Topolski, Scott)
February 15, 2022 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement by James S. Adler (Topolski, Scott)
February 15, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of a Related Action by James S. Adler (Topolski, Scott)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/15/2022. (MEJ)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #23), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/15/2022. (MEJ)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2023 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the March 2023 Trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/22/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/15/2022. (MEJ)
February 11, 2022 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Elegant, Justin)
January 28, 2022 Filing 21 STATUS report by Estate of Mimi Adler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Elegant, Justin)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by February 11, 2022, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/21/2022. (DMD)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #18). Response now due February 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/21/2022. (DMD)
January 21, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by James S. Adler. (Topolski, Scott)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on its efforts to perfect service of process on Defendant by January 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/21/2022. (DMD)
January 3, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Estate of Mimi Adler. Related case(s): Yes (Elegant, Justin)
January 3, 2022 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Estate of Mimi Adler. (Elegant, Justin)
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of compliance re 8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estate of Mimi Adler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 12/21/2021 Payment Receipt)(Elegant, Justin)
December 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
December 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
December 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/28/2021. (TWL)
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Taleah E. Jennings may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/22/2021. (BMM)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Justin B. Elegant on behalf of Estate of Mimi Adler. Lead Counsel: Taleah E. Jennings. (Elegant, Justin)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Taleah E. Jennings to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19053643 for $150 by Estate of Mimi Adler. (Elegant, Justin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Taleah E. Jennings Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Plaintiff's Counsels of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to James S. Adler. (BD)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-2953-VMC-AEP. (SJB)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James S Adler (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19048623) filed by Estate of Mimi Adler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Elegant, Justin) Modified on 12/21/2021 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Mimi Adler v. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Mimi Adler
Represented By: Justin B. Elegant
Represented By: Taleah E. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Adler
Represented By: Scott John Topolski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gregory P. Holder
Represented By: Gregory P. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?