EDST, LLC et al v. iApartments, Inc.
Plaintiff: EDST, LLC and QUEXT IoT, LLC
Defendant: iAPARTMENTS, INC.
Case Number: 8:2022cv00272
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Dean Adrian Kent on behalf of iApartments, Inc. Lead Counsel: Gregory S. Gewirtz. (Kent, Dean) Modified text on 3/31/2022 (MCB).
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gilchrist, Brian)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before May 4, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 30, 2022. (TLM)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint by iApartments, Inc. (Kent, Dean) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified text on 3/29/2022 (MCB).
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 29, 2022. (TLM)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Irene Bassel Frick terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 29, 2022. (TLM)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Gregory S. Gewirtz to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19386240 for $150 by iApartments, Inc. (Kent, Dean) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified text on 3/28/2022 (MCB).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Irene Bassel Frick to Withdraw as Attorney by iApartments, Inc.(Bassel Frick, Irene) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified on 3/25/2022 (CTR).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion for Extension. The parties shall file their Case Management Report on or before March 30, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 24, 2022. (TLM)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by EDST, LLC, Quext IoT, LLC. (Gilchrist, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Irene Bassel Frick on behalf of iApartments, Inc. (Bassel Frick, Irene)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brian R. Gilchrist on behalf of EDST, LLC, Quext IoT, LLC. Lead Counsel: Robert Greeson. (Gilchrist, Brian)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on February 18, 2022. (TLM)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on February 18, 2022. (TLM)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Erik O. Janitens to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19245481 for $150 by EDST, LLC, Quext IoT, LLC. (Gilchrist, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Robert Greeson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19245459 for $150 by EDST, LLC, Quext IoT, LLC. (Gilchrist, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by EDST, LLC, Quext IoT, LLC. Related case(s): No (Gilchrist, Brian)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean Adrian Kent on behalf of iApartments, Inc. (Kent, Dean)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MCB)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against iApartments, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by EDST, LLC, Quext IoT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 10,825,273, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent 10,803,685, #3 Exhibit C - US Patent 11,189,118)(Gilchrist, Brian)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/8/22 by iApartments, Inc. as to iApartments, Inc. (Kent, Dean) Modified text on 2/8/2022 (MCB).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED: The Complaint #1 is DISMISSED, without prejudice, as a shotgun pleading. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint on or before February 21, 2022, which cures the deficiencies discussed in this Order. Failure to file the amended complaint within the time provided will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/7/2022. (CSS)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (BD)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE to counsels Robert Greeson and Erik Janitens of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to iApartments, Inc. (BD)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-0272-CEH-JSS. (SJB)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by EDST, LLC, Quext IoT, LLC. (Gilchrist, Brian) Modified on 2/2/2022 to correct docket text (BD).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against iApartments, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19184391) filed by EDST, LLC, Quest IoT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 10,825,273, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent 10,803,685, #3 Exhibit C - US Patent 11,189,118, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilchrist, Brian) Modified on 2/2/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDST, LLC et al v. iApartments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDST, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Gilchrist
Represented By: Robert Greeson
Represented By: Erik Owen Janitens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUEXT IoT, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Gilchrist
Represented By: Robert Greeson
Represented By: Erik Owen Janitens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iAPARTMENTS, INC.
Represented By: Dean Adrian Kent
Represented By: Gregory S. Gewirtz
Represented By: Irene Bassel Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?