Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Ronald Panella, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Casualty Co.
Defendant: Ronald Panella, Best Care Medical Group, Inc., Jorge Consuegra, Gulf Bay Care, LLC, Carlos Enrique Fossi, Yunier Rodriguez, Rosmery Linares-Chi, Memorial Medical Center, Inc., Liusbit Portal, Mavys Huice Sosa, Metropolitan Medical Group, LLC, Jorge Rodriguez-Lorenzo, Serenity Medical Rehab, Inc., Liamarelis Hurtado-Hernandez, Guardian Angel Health Services, Inc., Alexeis Macuya-Horta, Murthy Ravipati, Stephen Diamantides, Luis Merced, Tamara Soto, Mario Morales, Glenda Santiago, Eiliany Gonzalez, Claudia Hernandez, Walter Diaz, Raquel Oliva, Arianna Perez, Anetter M. De Dios Luis, Neyda Silva, Josefina Sosa, Addrys Abella Torres, Maylet Lima and Humberto Lopez
Case Number: 8:2022cv00321
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Filing 57 RETURN of service executed on 2/24/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Alexeis Macuya-Horta. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Alexis Macuya-Horta)(Wenger, Kristen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 56 RETURN of service executed on 2/24/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Addrys Abella Torres. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Addrys Abella Torres, LMT)(Wenger, Kristen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 55 RETURN of service executed on 2/24/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Rosmery Linares-Chi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Rosmery Linares-Chi)(Wenger, Kristen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 54 RETURN of service executed on 2/28/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Mavys Huice Sosa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Mavys Huice Sosa, LMT)(Wenger, Kristen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 53 RETURN of service executed on 2/28/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Eiliany Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Eilany Gonzalez, LMT)(Wenger, Kristen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 52 RETURN of service executed on 2/28/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Anetter M. De Dios Luis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Anetter M. De Dios Luis, LMT)(Wenger, Kristen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 51 RETURN of service executed on 2/28/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Glenda Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Glenda Santiago, LMT)(Wenger, Kristen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 50 RETURN of service executed on 3/1/22 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Josefina Sosa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Josefina Sosa, LMT)(Wenger, Kristen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 49 RETURN of service executed on 3/24/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Murthy Ravipati. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Murthy Ravipati, MD)(Wenger, Kristen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 48 RETURN of service executed on 3/3/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Tamara Soto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Tamara Soto, LMT)(Wenger, Kristen)
April 1, 2022 Filing 47 RETURN of service executed on 3/3/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Jorge Consuegra. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Jorge Consuegra)(Wenger, Kristen)
March 22, 2022 Filing 46 RETURN of service executed on 2/23/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Maylet Lima. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Maylet Lima, LMT)(Wenger, Kristen)
March 22, 2022 Filing 45 RETURN of service executed on 2/24/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Claudia Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Claudia Hernandez, LMT)(Wenger, Kristen)
March 22, 2022 Filing 44 RETURN of service executed on 2/24/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Neyda Silva. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Neyda Silva, LMT)(Wenger, Kristen)
March 22, 2022 Filing 43 RETURN of service executed on 2/24/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Jorge Rodriguez-Lorenzo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Jose Rodriguez-Lorenzo)(Wenger, Kristen)
March 22, 2022 Filing 42 RETURN of service executed on 2/23/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Luis Merced. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Luis Merced, MD)(Wenger, Kristen)
March 22, 2022 Filing 41 RETURN of service executed on 2/24/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Ronald Panella. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Ronald Panella, MD)(Wenger, Kristen)
March 22, 2022 Filing 40 RETURN of service executed on 2/23/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Carlos Enrique Fossi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Carlos Enrique Fossi, MD)(Wenger, Kristen)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/17/2022. (ABC)
March 15, 2022 Filing 38 RETURN of service executed on 2/17/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Metropolitan Medical Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Metropolitan Medical Group, LLC)(Wenger, Kristen)
March 15, 2022 Filing 37 RETURN of service executed on 2/17/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Best Care Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Best Care Medical Group, Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen) Modified on 3/15/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 15, 2022 Filing 36 RETURN of service executed on 2/17/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Memorial Medical Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Memorial Medical Center Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen) Modified on 3/15/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 15, 2022 Filing 35 RETURN of service executed on 2/17/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Gulf Bay Care, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Gulf Bay Care, LLC)(Wenger, Kristen)
March 15, 2022 Filing 34 RETURN of service executed on 2/17/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Serenity Medical Rehab, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Serenity Medical Rehab Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen) Modified on 3/15/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 15, 2022 Filing 33 RETURN of service executed on 2/17/2022 by GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Co. as to Guardian Angel Health Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Guardian Angel Health Services Inc.)(Wenger, Kristen) Modified on 3/15/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 11, 2022 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ronald Panella. (Leib, Leighton)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court grants Defendants' Metropolitan Medical Group and Rodriguez-Lorenzo #29 unopposed motion. Their response is due April 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/10/2022. (EDB)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court grants Defendants' Serenity Medical and Hurtado-Hernandez #25 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendants' response is due April 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/10/2022. (EDB)
March 10, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Metropolitan Medical Group, LLC. (Fernandez, Ralph)
March 10, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph E. Fernandez on behalf of Jorge Rodriguez-Lorenzo. (Fernandez, Ralph) Modified on 3/11/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 10, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph E. Fernandez on behalf of Metropolitan Medical Group, LLC. (Fernandez, Ralph) Modified on 3/11/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 10, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Brian Schurr on behalf of Liamarelis Hurtado-Hernandez, Serenity Medical Rehab, Inc. (Schurr, Kenneth)
March 10, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Liamarelis Hurtado-Hernandez, Serenity Medical Rehab, Inc. (Schurr, Kenneth) Modified on 3/11/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court grants Defendant Panella's #23 unopposed motion for extension of time. Panella must respond to the complaint by May 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/8/2022. (EDB)
March 8, 2022 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Ronald Panella. (Leib, Leighton)
March 8, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Designation of Lead Counsel & Appearance by Leighton Leib on behalf of Ronald Panella. (Leib, Leighton) Modified on 3/9/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 7, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Steven T. Henesy to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Marino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
March 7, 2022 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Steven T. Henesy, appearing on behalf of GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Filing fee $150 receipt number AFLMDC-19307620.) Related document: #21 Unopposed MOTION for Steven T. Henesy to appear pro hac vice . (AG)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court grants Defendants' #11, #12, #13, and #18 motions for extension of time. The named Defendants must respond to the Complaint by May 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/4/2022. (EDB)
March 3, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Gulf Bay Care, LLC, Claudia Hernandez, Rosmery Linares-Chi, Yunier Rodriguez. (Rankin, Mark)
March 3, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to May 1, 2022 by Gulf Bay Care, LLC, Claudia Hernandez, Rosmery Linares-Chi, Yunier Rodriguez. (Rankin, Mark)
March 3, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Rankin on behalf of Gulf Bay Care, LLC, Claudia Hernandez, Rosmery Linares-Chi, Yunier Rodriguez (Rankin, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Walter Diaz, Memorial Medical Center, Inc., Liusbit Portal, Mavys Huice Sosa. (Rankin, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Best Care Medical Group, Inc., Jorge Consuegra, Eiliany Gonzalez, Mario Morales, Glenda Santiago, Tamara Soto. (Rankin, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by Guardian Angel Health Services, Inc., Maylet Lima, Alexeis Macuya-Horta, Addrys Abella Torres. (Rankin, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to May 1, 2022 by Walter Diaz, Memorial Medical Center, Inc., Liusbit Portal, Mavys Huice Sosa. (Rankin, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to May 1, 2022 by Best Care Medical Group, Inc., Jorge Consuegra, Eiliany Gonzalez, Mario Morales, Glenda Santiago, Tamara Soto. (Rankin, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to May 1, 2022 by Guardian Angel Health Services, Inc., Maylet Lima, Alexeis Macuya-Horta, Addrys Abella Torres. (Rankin, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Rankin on behalf of Walter Diaz, Memorial Medical Center, Inc., Liusbit Portal, Mavys Huice Sosa. (Rankin, Mark) Modified on 3/3/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Rankin on behalf of Best Care Medical Group, Inc., Jorge Consuegra, Eiliany Gonzalez, Mario Morales, Glenda Santiago, Tamara Soto. (Rankin, Mark) Modified on 3/3/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Rankin on behalf of Guardian Angel Health Services, Inc., Maylet Lima, Alexeis Macuya-Horta, Addrys Abella Torres. (Rankin, Mark) Modified on 3/3/2022 to edit text (CRK).
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Corporate Parent Birkshire Hathaway for GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Marino, John) Modified on 2/24/2022 to edit text (CRK).
February 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Related case(s): No (Marino, John)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING CIVIL CASE ORDER. The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within 40 days after any Defendant appears. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/9/2022. (EDB)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Best Care Medical Group, Inc., Jorge Consuegra, Anetter M. De Dios Luis, Stephen Diamantides, Walter Diaz, Carlos Enrique Fossi, Eiliany Gonzalez, Guardian Angel Health Services, Inc., Gulf Bay Care, LLC, Claudia Hernandez, Liamarelis Hurtado-Hernandez, Maylet Lima, Rosmery Linares-Chi, Humberto Lopez, Alexeis Macuya-Horta, Memorial Medical Center, Inc., Luis Merced, Metropolitan Medical Group, LLC, Mario Morales, Raquel Oliva, Ronald Panella, Arianna Perez, Liusbit Portal, Murthy Ravipati, Yunier Rodriguez, Jorge Rodriguez-Lorenzo, Glenda Santiago, Serenity Medical Rehab, Inc., Neyda Silva, Josefina Sosa, Mavys Huice Sosa, Tamara Soto, Addrys Abella Torres. (BD)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:22-cv-0321-KKM-TGW. (SJB)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19211055) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Best Care Medical RICO Chart, #2 Exhibit 2-Gulf Bay Care RICO Chart, #3 Exhibit 3-Memorial Medical RICO Chart, #4 Exhibit 4-Metropolitan Medical RICO Chart, #5 Exhibit 5-Serenity Medical RICO Chart, #6 Exhibit 6-Guardian Angel Health RICO Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Wenger, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Ronald Panella, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Panella
Represented By: Leighton Leib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Care Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Consuegra
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Bay Care, LLC
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Enrique Fossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yunier Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosmery Linares-Chi
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liusbit Portal
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mavys Huice Sosa
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Medical Group, LLC
Represented By: Ralph E. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Rodriguez-Lorenzo
Represented By: Ralph E. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serenity Medical Rehab, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Brian Schurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liamarelis Hurtado-Hernandez
Represented By: Kenneth Brian Schurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Angel Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexeis Macuya-Horta
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murthy Ravipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Diamantides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Merced
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Soto
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Morales
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Santiago
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eiliany Gonzalez
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Hernandez
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Diaz
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raquel Oliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arianna Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anetter M. De Dios Luis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neyda Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josefina Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addrys Abella Torres
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maylet Lima
Represented By: Mark P. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humberto Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?