Mahone v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christopher Mahone
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2022cv00440
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER approving Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/19/2022. (BGS)
April 18, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
April 5, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Christopher Mahone. (Escarraz, Enrique)
April 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Christopher Mahone. Related case(s): No (Escarraz, Enrique)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's memorandum of law due in 60 days; Defendant's memorandum of law due 60 days after service of Plaintiff's memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 5, 2022. (TLM)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
April 4, 2022 Filing 8 SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re #7 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix)(Rudy, John)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John)
February 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on February 24, 2022. (TLM)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (BD)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-0440-CEH-JSS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. (SJB)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Christopher Mahone. (Escarraz, Enrique)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Christopher Mahone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Appeals Council, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Escarraz, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahone v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mahone
Represented By: Enrique Escarraz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?