Rosado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Judyann Rosado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2022cv00493
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff memorandum due on or before 6/13/2022 Defendant memorandum due on or before 7/28/2022. See attached order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 4/29/2022. (AMS)
April 28, 2022 Filing 12 SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re #9 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Appendix, #16 Appendix, #17 Appendix, #18 Appendix, #19 Appendix, #20 Appendix, #21 Appendix, #22 Appendix, #23 Appendix)(Rudy, John)
April 28, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
April 28, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 3/3/2022. (AMS)
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (BD)
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:22-cv-0493-SDM-CPT. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (SJB)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Judyann Rosado. Related case(s): No (Berger, Erik)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Judyann Rosado. (Berger, Erik)
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Judyann Rosado. (Berger, Erik)
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Judyann Rosado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Berger, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judyann Rosado
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?