Markle v. Markle
Plaintiff: Samantha M Markle and Samantha M. Markle
Defendant: Meghan Markle
Case Number: 8:2022cv00511
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ENDORSED ORDER granting #87 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Plaintiff may file a surreply consisting of no more than six (6) pages on or before 6/5/2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/31/2023. (AB)
May 31, 2023 Filing 87 MOTION to Correct 86 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Sur-reply to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and in Favor of the Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. by Samantha M. Markle. (Ticktin, Peter)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #83 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. The motion lacks a good-faith conferral certification. Local R. M.D. Fla. 3.01(g). Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/31/2023. (AB)
May 31, 2023 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Modify #49 Case Management Scheduling Order by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
May 31, 2023 Filing 84 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on December 18, 2023 before Mary Ruth Houston, Esq. (Fojo, Ryan)
May 30, 2023 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Surreply by Samantha M. Markle. (Fojo, Ryan)
May 25, 2023 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in support re #74 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ENDORSED ORDER granting #80 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint. Defendant may file a reply consisting of no more than six (6) pages on or before 5/29/2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/22/2023. (AB)
May 22, 2023 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
May 18, 2023 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Samantha M. Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ticktin, Peter)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Joint Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order #77 is GRANTED. See Order for new scheduling deadlines. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/18/2023. (BGS)
May 18, 2023 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery due by 1/2/2024, Dispositive motions due by 2/2/2024, Pretrial statement due by 5/17/2024, All other motions due by 5/28/2024, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2024 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 7/1/2024 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/29/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (BGS)
May 9, 2023 Filing 77 Joint MOTION to Modify #61 Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement, Unopposed by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 75 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Partially Unopposed by Meghan Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Bitman, Ronnie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
April 21, 2023 Filing 73 ***STRICKEN; DISCOVERY NOTICE ATTACHED; COUNSEL NOTIFIED*** NOTICE by Samantha M. Markle Plaintiff's Notice of Serving Responses to Defendant's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories (Penalta, Gabrielle) Modified text on 4/26/2023 (SET). (SET).
April 13, 2023 Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against Meghan Markle with Jury Demand. filed by Samantha M. Markle.(Fojo, Ryan)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDERED: 1. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #34 is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff's defamation claims based on the contents of the book Finding Freedom are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 3. Plaintiff's defamation claims based on Defendant's CBS interview and her claim for injurious falsehood are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of this order. 4. Defendant's request for Attorneys' fees and costs under the anti-SLAPP statute are denied, without prejudice, as premature. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/30/2023. (AB)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying #59 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/15/2023. (ABC)
February 17, 2023 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Compel Coordination of Depositions filed by Meghan Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bitman, Ronnie)
February 17, 2023 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING (via Zoom) held on FEBRUARY 15, 2023 before Judge CHARLENE EDWARDS HONEYWELL. Court Reporter/Transcriber: SHARON A. MILLER. Email address: Sharon_miller@flmd.uscourts.gov. Telephone number: 8133015041. NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely available to the public without redaction after ninety (90) calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 3/10/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2023. (SAM)
February 16, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE by Samantha M. Markle re #64 Motion Hearing, Correction of Record (Young, Taylor)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORAL ORDER: Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #35 is GRANTED for the reasons stated on the record. The Court will take judicial notice as to the existence of (a) one chapter from one book (i.e., chapter 12 from Finding Freedom, by Omid Scobie and Carolyn Durand); (b) two New Mexico state court dockets involving Plaintiff; and (c) the date of Prince Harry's announcement that he was dating Meghan. Counsel withdraws the request to take judicial notice as to (d) Plaintiff's admissions on a television interview with Good Morning Britain available on YouTube. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/15/2023. (BGS) Modified on 2/15/2023.
February 15, 2023 Filing 64 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell: MOTION HEARING held on 2/15/2023 re #35 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Judicial Notice filed by Meghan Markle, #34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Meghan Markle. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Miller (BGS)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying without prejudice #60 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/10/2023. (ABC)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED: Defendant Markle's Motion to Stay Discovery #54 is denied. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/7/2023. (AB)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's Joint Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order #56 is GRANTED. See Order for new scheduling deadlines. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/7/2023. (BGS)
February 7, 2023 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery due by 7/3/2023, Dispositive motions due by 8/4/2023, Pretrial statement due by 11/14/2023, All other motions due by 11/21/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2023 at 2:15 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 1/2/2024 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/23/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (BGS)
February 3, 2023 Filing 60 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to First Request for Production First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Admissions by Samantha M. Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Young, Taylor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
February 3, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION to Compel Coordination of Depositions by Samantha M. Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Young, Taylor) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
February 1, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE to counsel Nicholas Soltman of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
February 1, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions re #35 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Judicial Notice, #34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Motions Hearing set for 2/15/2023 at 1:30 PM via zoom video conference before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. The motions hearing scheduled for FEBRUARY 15, 2023 at 1:30PM will be conducted via ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE. The Clerk will be sending everyone an invitation to the meeting via email. If you have any questions, please contact courtroom deputy, Bettye Samuel, at Bettye_Samuel@flmd.uscourts.gov. Although the hearing is taking place by video, all parties should dress appropriately for this Court proceeding. Furthermore, you are hereby reminded that under Local Rule 5.01 the taking of photographs, the operation of recording or transmission devices, and the broadcasting or televising of proceedings in any courtroom or hearing room of this Court, or the environs thereof, either while the Court is in session or at recesses between sessions when Court officials, lawyers, jurors, witnesses or other persons connected with judicial proceedings of any kind are present, are prohibited. Additionally, please dress appropriately for the hearing.(BGS)
January 9, 2023 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Modify #49 Case Management Scheduling Order by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
October 4, 2022 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of Dispositive Motion filed by Samantha M. Markle. (Young, Taylor)
September 30, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of Dispositive Motion by Meghan Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bitman, Ronnie)
September 2, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE by Samantha M. Markle of Service of Initial Disclosures (Young, Taylor)
August 17, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on June 23, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. before Mary Ruth Houston, Esq. (Young, Taylor)
August 17, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on June 23, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. before Mary Ruth Houston, Esq. (Young, Taylor)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/3/2023, Dispositive motions due by 5/5/2023, Pretrial statement due by 8/22/2023, All other motions due by 8/29/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2023 at 3:15 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 10/2/2023 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/31/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/3/2022. (BGS)
July 25, 2022 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: The Court will take no further action on the Order to Show Cause #40, and it is discharged. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/21/2022. (GLP)
July 20, 2022 Filing 46 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Samantha M. Markle. (Young, Taylor)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #44 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss and Request for Judicial Notice. Defendant may file a reply, not to exceed six (6) pages, on or before July 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/14/2022. (GLP)
July 14, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Request for Judicial Notice, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
July 13, 2022 Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Young, Taylor)
July 8, 2022 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Samantha M. Markle by Samantha M. Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sasson, Jamie)
July 8, 2022 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Samantha M. Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Sasson, Jamie)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff, as the party responsible for this action's prosecution, is hereby directed to SHOW CAUSE by filing a written response within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this order, indicating why the Court should not dismiss this action under Local Rule 3.10 for lack of prosecution due to the non-filing of a case management report within the time prescribed by Local Rule 3.02. Failure to respond will result in the Court dismissing this action without further notice. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/6/2022. (GLP)
July 1, 2022 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Samantha Markle re: #38 Objection by Samantha M. Markle. (Young, Taylor)
July 1, 2022 Filing 38 OBJECTION re #35 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Judicial Notice . (Young, Taylor)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #17 Defendant Meghan, the Duchess of Sussex's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/21/2022. (GLP)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Judge Honeywell #33 is DENIED. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/21/2022. (GLP)
June 17, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Judicial Notice by Meghan Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bitman, Ronnie)
June 17, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
June 17, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Charlene E. Honeywell by Samantha M. Markle. (Young, Taylor)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Substitute Attorney; granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Douglas A. Kahle terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/7/2022. (ABC)
June 3, 2022 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Samantha M. Markle.(Young, Taylor)
May 26, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Judicial Notice in Support of her Motion to Dismiss filed by Samantha M. Markle. (Young, Taylor)
May 25, 2022 Filing 29 Amended MOTION for Douglas A. Kahle to Withdraw as Attorney by Samantha M. Markle. (Kahle, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 20, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Alan Sasson on behalf of Samantha M. Markle (Sasson, Jamie)
May 20, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE by Meghan Markle re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Bitman, Ronnie)
May 13, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Samantha M. Markle. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/13/2022. (ABC)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/13/2022. (ABC)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/13/2022. (ABC)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #14 Motion to File Under Seal an Amended Motion to Withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/13/2022. (ABC)
May 13, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathan P. Steinsapir to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19567455 for $150 by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 13, 2022 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Nicholas C. Soltman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19567412 for $150 by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 13, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Michael J. Kump to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19567331 for $150 by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 13, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE by Meghan Markle re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael J. Kump, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Bitman, Ronnie)
May 13, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Judicial Notice by Meghan Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bitman, Ronnie)
May 13, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
May 13, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Meghan Markle. (Bitman, Ronnie)
May 9, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to File Under Seal an Amended Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff by Samantha M. Markle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kahle, Douglas)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/6/2022. (ABC)
April 25, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Douglas A. Kahle to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Samantha M. Markle. (Kahle, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 8 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Samantha M. Markle. (Kahle, Douglas)
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Samantha M. Markle. Related case(s): No (Kahle, Douglas)
April 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on March 16, 2022 by Samantha M. Markle as to Meghan Markle. (Kahle, Douglas)
March 15, 2022 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Samantha M. Markle. (Kahle, Douglas)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Samantha M. Markle. (Kahle, Douglas)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Meghan Markle. (BD)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/3/2022. (KAJ)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:22-cv-0511-CEH-TGW. (SJB)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meghan Markle with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19299153) filed by Samantha M. Markle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Summons)(Kahle, Douglas) Modified on 3/4/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markle v. Markle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha M Markle
Represented By: Douglas A. Kahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha M. Markle
Represented By: Douglas A. Kahle
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Taylor Young, I
Represented By: Peter Ticktin
Represented By: Ryan Scott Fojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan Markle
Represented By: Jonathan P. Steinsapir
Represented By: Michael J. Kump
Represented By: Nicholas Soltman
Represented By: Ronnie J Bitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?