Dish Network, L.L.C. et al v. Labossiere et al
Plaintiff: Dish Network, L.L.C., Sling TV, L.L.C. and Nagrastar, LLC
Defendant: Jason Labossiere individually and doing business as Expedite TV doing business as Mundo TV doing business as Must TV, Sean Beaman individually and doing business as Expedite TV doing business as Mundo TV doing business as Must TV, Stefan Gollner individually and doing business as Expedite TV doing business as Mundo TV doing business as Must TV and Osivette Brito individually and doing business as Expedite TV doing business as Mundo TV doing business as Must TV
Case Number: 8:2022cv00603
Filed: March 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605 Federal Communications Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on May 16, 2022 1:00 p.m. before Lawrence Watson. (Watson, Lawrence)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court DENIES #26 Defendant Gollner's Motion for Relief from this Court's Scheduling Orders. Because Gollner filed a #17 motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction in his first appearance before the Court, he faces no risk of waiving his personal jurisdiction objection by responding to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Lane v. XYZ Venture Partners, L.L.C., 322 F. App'x 675, 678 (11th Cir. 2009) ("While it is true that the defense of lack of personal jurisdiction can be waived by filing a motion which does not raise the defense, waiver is only accomplished if the defense is not asserted in the first motion made under Rule 12 or responsive pleading." (citations omitted)). And Gollner fails to show that his cost in responding to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction outweighs the prejudice posed to Plaintiffs in delaying the full resolution of their motion. Finally, the most efficient method for the Court to resolve the motions is to receive simultaneous briefing on both motions. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/3/2022. (SMR)
May 2, 2022 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION for Relief from Orders dated 4-6-22 and 4-25-22 filed by Dish Network, L.L.C., Nagrastar, LLC, Sling TV, L.L.C. (Frank, Timothy) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (AG).
April 27, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura H. Howard on behalf of Sean Beaman (Howard, Laura)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiffs must respond to Defendant Gollner's #26 Motion for Relief from the Scheduling Order no later than May 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/26/2022. (SMR)
April 25, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Relief from Orders dated 4-6-22 and 4-25-22 by Stefan Gollner. (Walters, Joel)
April 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' #24 Unopposed Motion to extend deadlines. Plaintiffs' responses to #17 Defendant Gollner's Motion to Dismiss are due May 19, 2022. Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are due May 20, 2022. Defendant Beaman's response to Plaintiff's complaint is due May 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/24/2022. (SMR)
April 22, 2022 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadlines Pending Settlement Discussions by Dish Network, L.L.C., Nagrastar, LLC, Sling TV, L.L.C. (Frank, Timothy) Modified text on 4/22/2022 (AG).
April 22, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanford R. Solomon on behalf of Sean Beaman (Solomon, Stanford)
April 20, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jason Labossiere. (Delrahim, David) Modified text on 4/20/2022 (AG).
April 15, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE by Dish Network, L.L.C., Nagrastar, LLC, Sling TV, L.L.C. re #14 Order pdf - Notice of Service of Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Frank, Timothy)
April 13, 2022 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on April 12, 2022 by Dish Network, L.L.C., Nagrastar, LLC, Sling TV, L.L.C. as to Sean Beaman. (Frank, Timothy)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Timothy Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/8/2022. (DK)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court grants Defendant Brito's #16 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant must respond to the complaint no later than May 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/8/2022. (EDB)
April 7, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Stefan Gollner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Walters, Joel)
April 7, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Osivette Brito by Dish Network, L.L.C., Nagrastar, LLC, Sling TV, L.L.C. (Boatman, James)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Defendant Labossiere's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Labossiere must respond no later than April 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/7/2022. (SMR)
April 7, 2022 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Timothy Frank (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA066220.) Related document: #12 MOTION for Timothy Frank to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting deadlines for consideration of Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Asset Freeze. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/6/2022. (SMR)
April 6, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Asset Freeze by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Duval, #2 Declaration of Kevin Gedeon, #3 Exhibits 1-8 to Declaration of Kevin Gedeon, #4 Exhibits 9-10 to Declaration of Kevin Gedeon, #5 Exhibits 11-20 to Declaration of Kevin Gedeon, #6 Exhibits 21-40 to Declaration of Kevin Gedeon, #7 Exhibits 41-60 to Declaration of Kevin Gedeon, #8 Exhibits 61-77 to Declaration of Kevin Gedeon, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(Boatman, James)
April 6, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Timothy Frank to appear pro hac vice by Dish Network, L.L.C., Nagrastar, LLC, Sling TV, L.L.C. (Frank, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Jason Labossiere. (Delrahim, David) Modified as to docket text and entry relationship on 4/6/2022 (JK).
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Delrahim on behalf of Jason Labossiere (Delrahim, David)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on March 17, 2022 by Dish Network, L.L.C., Nagrastar, LLC, Sling TV, L.L.C. as to Stefan Gollner. (Boatman, James)
March 23, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on March 16, 2022 by Dish Network, L.L.C., Nagrastar, LLC, Sling TV, L.L.C. as to Osivette Brito. (Boatman, James)
March 23, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on March 16, 2022 by Dish Network, L.L.C., Nagrastar, LLC, Sling TV, L.L.C. as to Jason Labossiere. (Boatman, James)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING CIVIL CASE ORDER. The parties must file a case management report within 40 days after any Defendant appears. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/16/2022. (EDB)
March 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Sean Beaman, Osivette Brito, Stefan Gollner, Jason Labossiere. (BD)
March 15, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC, Sling TV L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent DISH Technologies L.L.C. for Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC, Sling TV L.L.C. (Boatman, James) Modified on 3/16/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC, Sling TV L.L.C. Related case(s): Yes (Boatman, James) Modified on 3/16/2022 to edit text (CRK).
March 15, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-0603-KKM-SPF. (SJB)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19342605) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Boatman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dish Network, L.L.C. et al v. Labossiere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network, L.L.C.
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sling TV, L.L.C.
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagrastar, LLC
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Labossiere individually and doing business as Expedite TV doing business as Mundo TV doing business as Must TV
Represented By: David S. Delrahim
Represented By: Julia Reidy Kapusta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Beaman individually and doing business as Expedite TV doing business as Mundo TV doing business as Must TV
Represented By: Laura H. Howard
Represented By: Stanford R. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan Gollner individually and doing business as Expedite TV doing business as Mundo TV doing business as Must TV
Represented By: Joel W. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osivette Brito individually and doing business as Expedite TV doing business as Mundo TV doing business as Must TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?