El Missaoui v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sofia El Missaoui
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2022cv00814
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff memorandum due by 7/18/2022, Defendant memorandum due by 9/1/2022, Plaintiff reply brief due by 9/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 6/3/2022. (CDM)
June 2, 2022 Filing 14 SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re #12 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Appendix, #16 Appendix, #17 Appendix, #18 Appendix, #19 Appendix, #20 Appendix, #21 Appendix, #22 Appendix, #23 Appendix, #24 Appendix, #25 Appendix, #26 Appendix, #27 Appendix, #28 Appendix, #29 Appendix, #30 Appendix, #31 Appendix, #32 Appendix, #33 Appendix, #34 Appendix, #35 Appendix, #36 Appendix)(Rudy, John)
June 2, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
June 2, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John)
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sofia El Missaoui. Related case(s): No (Avard, Carol)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Sofia El Missaoui. (Avard, Carol)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
April 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (LNR)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Elder, Nadine)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/7/2022. (CDM)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:22-cv-0814-VMC-AAS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (SJB)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sofia El Missaoui. (Avard, Carol)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Sofia El Missaoui. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Missaoui v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia El Missaoui
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?