Edmonds v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: ARNOLD EDMONDS
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., ALFA LAVAL INC., THE DELAVAL SEPARATOR COMPANY, SHARPLES CORP., CRANE CO., DEMING PUMP CO.,, COCHRANE CORPORATION, CHAPMAN VALVE CO., SWARTWOUT CO., ELLIOT COMPANY, a/k/a ELLIOT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC., FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, JOHN CRANE, INC., f/k/a CRANE PACKING, PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC.,, CBS CORP., f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION, BF STURTEVANT CO., VELAN VALVE CORP., WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc;, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY, CARRIER CORPORATION, CATERPILLAR INC., CROWN CORK & SEAL CO., INC., ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, FLOWSERVE US, INC., EDWARD VALVE, INC., NORDSTROM VALVES, INC., EDWARD VOGT VALVE COMPANY, VOGT VALVE COMPANY, FMC CORPORATION, NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY,, PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, GARDNER DENVER, INC., GOULDS PUMP LLC, GRINNELL LLL, d/b/a GRINNELL CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., BENDIX CORPORATION, HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC, BELL & GOSSETT and FOSTER ENGINEERING, LAMONS GASKET COMPANY a/k/a LAMONS METAL GASKET CO, METROLPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.;, SPIRAX SARCO INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, WARREN PUMPS, LLC, QUIMBY PUMP CO.;, Elliot Company, Paramount Global, Deming Pump Co., Elliot Turbomachinery Co., Inc., Crane Packing, John Crane, Inc., Viacomcbs Inc., CBS Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, CBS Corp., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. doing business as Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Northern Pump Company, Goulps Pump LLC, Grinnell LLL, IMO Industries, Inc., Lamons Gasket Company, Metrolpolitan Life Insurance Co., Quimby Pump Co., Armstrong International, Inc. and Alfa Laval, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Jonathan Hollingshead
Case Number: 8:2022cv00825
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
2 Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 288 First Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Melaragno, Peter)
November 20, 2023 Filing 287 Second Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Melaragno, Peter)
November 20, 2023 Filing 286 Second Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Spirax Sarco Inc..(Melaragno, Peter)
November 20, 2023 Filing 285 Second Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO Industries, Inc..(Melaragno, Peter)
November 20, 2023 Filing 284 Second Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Melaragno, Peter)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDERED: 1) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant General Electric Company are dismissed, without prejudice. 2) The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant General Electric Company as a party to this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/16/2023. (AB)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ENDORSED ORDER granting #215 Motion to Amend; granting #216 Motion to Amend; granting #217 Motion to Amend; granting #218 Motion to Amend; granting #219 Motion to Amend. As leave to amend should be freely granted when justice so requires, Defendants are granted leave to amend their answers and affirmative defenses. Amended answers and affirmative defenses shall be filed on or before November 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/9/2023. (AB)
November 9, 2023 Filing 281 NOTICE of settlement as to Lamons Gasket Company, only, by Arnold Edmonds (Early, Kelsey)
November 8, 2023 Filing 280 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 10/27/2023. Hearing outcome: Completely resolved between plaintiff and one defendant, Lamons Gasket Company and counsel have been instructed to file a joint stipulation regarding those claims which have been resolved within ten (10) days. The mediation resulted in an impasse with all remaining defendants.(AA)
November 8, 2023 Filing 279 NOTICE of settlement as to Caterpillar INC., by Arnold Edmonds (Early, Kelsey)
October 26, 2023 Filing 277 NOTICE of settlement of Honeywell Int., Inc., only, by Arnold Edmonds (Early, Kelsey)
October 26, 2023 Filing 276 JOINT Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Union Carbide Corporation. (Cobbs, Ryan) (Modified on 10/27/2023, to edit text) (BGR).
October 26, 2023 Filing 275 NOTICE of settlement as to Flowserve US, INC., only, by Arnold Edmonds (Early, Kelsey)
October 26, 2023 Filing 274 NOTICE of settlement as to Paramount Global, LLC, only, by Arnold Edmonds (Early, Kelsey)
October 26, 2023 Filing 273 NOTICE of settlement as to FMC Corporation, only, by Arnold Edmonds (Early, Kelsey)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ENDORSED ORDER granting #269 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Daubert Motions and Dispositive Motions. The deadline for Daubert Motions and Dispositive Motions is now December 1, 2023. Based on this extension, the Court will likely continue, by separate order, the current April 2024 trial date. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/26/2023. (AB)
October 26, 2023 Filing 271 NOTICE of settlement by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
October 17, 2023 Filing 270 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 10/27/23 before Jon Hollingshead. (Early, Kelsey)
October 17, 2023 Filing 269 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions and Dispositive Motions by Electrolux Home Products, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Spirax Sarco Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
September 22, 2023 Filing 268 NOTICE of settlement of Howden North America, Inc. by Arnold Edmonds (Early, Kelsey)
September 18, 2023 Filing 266 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal of Grinnell, LLC., only, by Arnold Edmonds. (Early, Kelsey) Modified text on 9/18/2023 (KME).
September 18, 2023 Filing 265 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal of Goulds Pumps, Inc., only, by Arnold Edmonds. (Early, Kelsey) Modified text on 9/18/2023 (KME).
September 15, 2023 Filing 264 REPLY to Response to Motion re #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated and Memorandum of Law filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Briscoe, Edward)
September 15, 2023 Filing 263 REPLY to Response to Motion re #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Spirax Sarco Inc. (Briscoe, Edward) Modified text on 9/18/2023 (KME).
September 15, 2023 Filing 262 REPLY to Response to Motion re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Briscoe, Edward) Modified text on 9/18/2023 (KME).
September 6, 2023 Filing 259 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ashley Christina Pearson Drumm on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. Lead Counsel: Ashley C. Drumm. (Drumm, Ashley Christina)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Joint Motion to Amend Case Management and Scheduling Order Deadlines #214 and the Joint Motion for Extension to Complete the Deposition of Captain R. Bruce Woodruff [Doc. 250] is GRANTED. See Order for new scheduling deadlines. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/5/2023. (CAB)
September 5, 2023 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery (expert discovery) due by 9/19/2023, Dispositive motions due by 11/1/2023, Joint Final Pretrial statement due by 2/15/2024, All other motions due by 2/23/2024, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2024 at 03:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13 A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 4/1/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13 A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 11/17/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (CAB)
September 1, 2023 Filing 257 RESPONSE in Opposition re #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated and Memorandum of Law by Warren Pumps, filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Early, Kelsey)
September 1, 2023 Filing 256 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated and Memorandum of Law by Warren Pumps, by Arnold Edmonds. (Early, Kelsey)
September 1, 2023 Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Electrolux Products Home Inc., filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Early, Kelsey)
September 1, 2023 Filing 254 RESPONSE in Opposition re #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Spirax Sarco, Inc., filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Early, Kelsey)
September 1, 2023 Filing 253 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Arnold Edmonds. (Early, Kelsey)
September 1, 2023 Filing 252 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Arnold Edmonds. (Early, Kelsey)
September 1, 2023 Filing 251 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Hanson Horn on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. Lead Counsel: (Horn, Hanson)
August 31, 2023 Filing 250 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Arnold Edmonds. (Early, Kelsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 30, 2023 Filing 248 NOTICE of compliance re 230 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Warren Pumps, LLC (Corcoran, Todd)
August 30, 2023 Filing 247 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
August 30, 2023 Filing 246 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
August 30, 2023 Filing 245 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
August 29, 2023 Filing 244 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kimberly Held Israel on behalf of Caterpillar Inc.. Lead Counsel: Kimberly Held Israel, Esq.. (Israel, Kimberly)
August 28, 2023 Filing 243 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Todd Carlton Alley, Rasheem Malik Johnson, Hanson Horn, Holly Weaver, Ryan S. Cobbs, Brianna Elizabeth Donet, Ashley Christina Pearson Drumm, John Charles Reddin, Eduardo J. Medina, Timothy J. Ferguson, Edward J. Briscoe, Peter J. Melaragno, T. Stephen Corcoran, Amanda Rae Cachaldora, Melanie E. Chung-Tims, Kimberly Held Israel, Alyssa Nicole Weiss, and John Charles Reddin of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
August 28, 2023 Filing 242 NOTICE of settlement by Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ENDORSED ORDER granting #239 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alexis Thomas terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/28/2023. (Flynn, Sean)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ENDORSED ORDER granting #238 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Madison McComas terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/28/2023. (Flynn, Sean)
August 25, 2023 Filing 239 MOTION for Alexis Thomas to Withdraw as Attorney by Arnold Edmonds. (Thomas, Alexis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 25, 2023 Filing 238 MOTION for Madison McComas to Withdraw as Attorney by Arnold Edmonds. (McComas, Madison) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER: 1) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Velan Valve Corp. are dismissed, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. 2) The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Velan Valve Corp. as a party to this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/25/2023. (AB)
August 24, 2023 Filing 236 NOTICE of settlement of Union Carbide Corporation, only, by Arnold Edmonds (Early, Kelsey)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motions to Extend Deadlines for Plaintiff's Response to Motions for Summary Judgment #232, #233, #234. Each of Plaintiff's Responses are now due on or before September 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/23/2023. (AB)
August 23, 2023 Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Arnold Edmonds. (Early, Kelsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 23, 2023 Filing 233 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Arnold Edmonds. (Early, Kelsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 23, 2023 Filing 232 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Warren Pumps LLC., Motion for Summary Judgment by Arnold Edmonds. (Early, Kelsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 22, 2023 Filing 231 STIPULATION of Dismissal for Velan Valve Corp, only, by Arnold Edmonds. (Early, Kelsey)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ENDORSED ORDER granting #229 Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stephen Corcoran may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(c)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/18/2023. (ACS)
August 17, 2023 Filing 229 MOTION for T. Stephen Corcoran to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21158342 for $150 by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Briscoe, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 16, 2023 Filing 228 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant General Electric Company by General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher) Modified to edit docket text on 8/17/2023 (HAI).
August 15, 2023 Filing 227 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Flowserve Us, Inc. (Alley, Todd)
August 15, 2023 Filing 226 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Blackmer Pump Company. (Alley, Todd)
August 4, 2023 Filing 225 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated and Memorandum of Law by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Melaragno, Peter)
August 4, 2023 Filing 224 SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE (CAB)
August 4, 2023 Filing 223 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Edward J. Briscoe and Peter J. Melaragno of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ENDORSED ORDER granting #214 Joint Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Management and Scheduling Order Deadlines. Upon a finding of good cause, the Parties' remaining case-management deadlines are extended as requested by the Parties. An amended Case Management and Scheduling Order will be entered by separate Order. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/4/2023. (AB)
August 3, 2023 Filing 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of John Spencer)(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 8/4/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
August 3, 2023 Filing 220 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Spirax Sarco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of John Spencer)(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 8/4/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
July 28, 2023 Filing 219 Second MOTION to Amend #155 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Valves and Controls' Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 7/31/2023 to edit text (ABC).
July 28, 2023 Filing 218 First MOTION to Amend #30 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warren Pumps First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Melaragno, Peter)
July 28, 2023 Filing 217 Second MOTION to Amend #154 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Spirax Sarco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spirax's Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 7/31/2023 to edit text (ABC).
July 28, 2023 Filing 216 First MOTION to Amend #29 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by IMO Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IMO's First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 7/31/2023 to edit text (ABC).
July 28, 2023 Filing 215 Second MOTION to Amend #153 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Electrolux's Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 7/31/2023 to edit text (ABC).
July 21, 2023 Filing 214 Joint MOTION to Amend Set/reset scheduling order deadlines - PUBLIC by Arnold Edmonds. (Thomas, Alexis)
July 14, 2023 Filing 213 REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (Briscoe, Edward)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ENDORSED ORDER granting #210 Defendant Armstrong International's Fourth Unopposed Motion Extending Expert Disclosure Deadlines. The deadline for Armstrong to serve its expert disclosure is extended to, and including, July 28, 2023. No further extensions will be granted. #194 Defendant Armstrong's Third Unopposed Motion Extending Expert Disclosure Deadlines is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/7/2023. (AB)
June 30, 2023 Filing 211 RESPONSE in Opposition re #192 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Plaintiff's Response to Defendant, Valves and Controls US, Inc. "Undisputed" Facts, #2 Exhibit A - Edmonds Depo Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - Woodruff Report, #4 Exhibit C - A&M Internal Memo, #5 Exhibit D - Zhang Report, #6 Exhibit E - Tsai Report)(Thomas, Alexis)
June 29, 2023 Filing 210 Fourth Unopposed MOTION Extending Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text on 7/2/2023 (BD).
June 26, 2023 Filing 209 REPLY to Response to Motion re #188 Final MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Lamons Gasket Company. (Villani, Madeline)
June 22, 2023 Filing 208 NOTICE of change of address by Steven D. Lehner (Lehner, Steven)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ENDORSED ORDER granting #206 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion.Plaintiff's Response is due by 6/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/21/2023. (ACS)
June 21, 2023 Filing 206 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #192 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Arnold Edmonds. (Thomas, Alexis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 14, 2023 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Madison McComas on behalf of Arnold Edmonds (McComas, Madison)
June 14, 2023 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ostrowski on behalf of Arnold Edmonds (Ostrowski, Mary)
June 12, 2023 Filing 203 RESPONSE re #189 Statement of undisputed facts filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Thomas, Alexis)
June 12, 2023 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #188 Final MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Edmonds Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Edmonds Deposition Handwritten List, #3 Exhibit C - 1960s Lamons Catalog, #4 Exhibit D - Tsai Report, #5 Exhibit E - Zhang Report)(Thomas, Alexis) Modified text on 6/13/2023 (MCB).
June 6, 2023 Filing 201 NOTICE by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. re #192 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit 4 Declaration of Marc Plisko, CIH, #2 Amended Exhibit 4 Exhibits to Declaration of Marc Plisko (ship drawings reviewed))(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 6/6/2023 (CTR).
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ENDORSED ORDER granting #199 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff's Response to #188 Defendant, Lamons Gasket Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Response is due 6/12/2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/6/2023. (AB)
June 6, 2023 Filing 199 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #188 Final MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Arnold Edmonds. (Thomas, Alexis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER: 1) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation are dismissed, without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. 2) The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as a party to this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/5/2023. (BGS)
June 5, 2023 Filing 197 NOTICE of compliance by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Briscoe, Edward)
June 2, 2023 Filing 196 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Melaragno, Peter)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Defendant is directed to provide to Chambers, in a binder, a courtesy copy of the Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Valves & Controls US, Inc. f/k/a Valves and Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Improperly Sued Herein As "Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. D/B/A Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.") #192 (including exhibits) within SEVEN (7) DAYS from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/2/2023. (BGS)
June 2, 2023 Filing 194 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 6/2/2023 (CTR).
June 1, 2023 Filing 193 NOTICE by Alfa Laval, Inc. Request for Removal from Service List and Request to Stop Electronic Notices (Kolos, Chris)
June 1, 2023 Filing 192 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Edmonds Arnold Deposition 08-23-22, #2 Exhibit 2 Edmonds Arnold Discovery Deposition 8-24-22 Vol. I, #3 Exhibit 3 Edmonds Arnold Discovery Deposition 8-25-22 Vol. II, #4 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Marc Plisko CIH, #5 Exhibit 5 Plaintiffs Written List of Products Used)(Briscoe, Edward) Modified on 6/1/2023 (CTR).
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ENDORSED ORDER granting #187 Defendant Armstrong International Inc.'s Second Unopposed Motion Extending Expert Disclosure Deadlines. The deadline for Armstrong to file its expert disclosure is extended to, and including, June 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/31/2023. (AB)
May 18, 2023 Filing 190 SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE (BGS)
May 17, 2023 Filing 189 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #188 Final MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Lamons Gasket Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Villani, Madeline)
May 17, 2023 Filing 188 Final MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Lamons Gasket Company. (Villani, Madeline)
May 16, 2023 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text on 5/16/2023 (MCB).
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ENDORSED ORDER granting #184 Defendant Armstrong International Inc.'s Unopposed Motion Extending Expert Disclosure Deadlines. The deadline for Armstrong to file its expert disclosure is extended to, and including, May 16, 2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/4/2023. (AB)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ENDORSED ORDER granting #162 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Disclosure of Defendants' Expert Witnesses and Expert Reports is 5/1/2023. The Rebuttal Expert Witness deadline is 5/19/2023. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/4/2023. (AB)
May 1, 2023 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 5/2/2023 (CTR).
April 26, 2023 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Monika Ledlova on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Ledlova, Monika)
April 24, 2023 ENTERED IN ERROR(CTR).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation are dismissed, without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation as a party to this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/24/2023. (BGS)
April 20, 2023 Filing 181 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Dardis, Erin)
April 10, 2023 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Briscoe, Edward)
April 10, 2023 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 10, 2023 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Briscoe, Edward)
April 10, 2023 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Melaragno, Peter)
April 10, 2023 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 10, 2023 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Melaragno, Peter)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ENDORSED ORDER terminating #169 Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court has already granted this request for relief (see Doc. 171). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/4/2023. (ACS)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ENDORSED ORDER granting [166, 170] Defendant Warren Pumps LLC's Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Amanda Rae Cachaldora and Melanie E. Chung-Tims are terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Warren Pumps LLC and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorney Todd Alley to remain counsel of record for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/4/2023. (ACS)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ENDORSED ORDER granting [165, 168] Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Amanda Rae Cachaldora and Melanie E. Chung-Tims are terminated terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorney Todd Alley to remain counsel of record for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/4/2023. (ACS)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ENDORSED ORDER granting [164, 167] Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Amanda Rae Cachaldora and Melanie E. Chung-Tims are terminated terminated as counsel of record for Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorney Todd Alley to remain counsel of record for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/4/2023. (ACS)
April 3, 2023 Filing 170 MOTION for Amanda Cachaldora to Withdraw as Attorney by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 3, 2023 Filing 169 MOTION for Amanda Cachaldora to Withdraw as Attorney by IMO Industries, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 4/4/2023 (CTR).
April 3, 2023 Filing 168 MOTION for Amanda Cachaldora to Withdraw as Attorney by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 3, 2023 Filing 167 MOTION for Amanda Cachaldora to Withdraw as Attorney by IMO Industries, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 4/4/2023 (CTR).
April 3, 2023 Filing 166 MOTION for Melanie Chung-Tims to Withdraw as Attorney by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 3, 2023 Filing 165 MOTION for Melanie Chung-Tims to Withdraw as Attorney by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 3, 2023 Filing 164 MOTION for Melanie Chung-Tims to Withdraw as Attorney by IMO Industries, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 4/4/2023 (CTR).
March 30, 2023 Filing 163 NOTICE of change of address by Melanie E. Chung-Tims (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
March 21, 2023 Filing 162 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Pretrial Deadlines by Blackmer Pump Company, Flowserve Us, Inc. (Alley, Todd) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 3/21/2023 (CTR).
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ENDORSED ORDER granting #160 Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Timothy J. Ferguson terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Caterpillar Inc. and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorneys Kimberly Held Israel and Alyssa Weiss are substituted as counsel for Defendant Caterpillar Inc.Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/20/2023. (ACS)
March 10, 2023 Filing 160 MOTION for Timothy J. Ferguson to Withdraw as Attorney by Caterpillar Inc.. (Ferguson, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Certain Pretrial Deadlines #158 is GRANTED. See Order for new scheduling deadlines. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/13/2023. (BGS)
February 13, 2023 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery due by 4/28/2023, Dispositive motions due by 8/4/2023, Pretrial statement due by 11/14/2023, All other motions due by 11/14/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2023 at 1:15 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 1/2/2024 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/20/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (BGS)
January 26, 2023 Filing 158 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certain Pretrial Deadlines by All Defendants. (Alley, Todd) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, only, are dismissed, without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company as a party to this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/19/2023. (BGS)
January 18, 2023 Filing 156 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Metrolpolitan Life Insurance Co. (Tacktill, Scott) Modified on 1/19/2023 (CTR).
January 17, 2023 Filing 155 AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 1/18/2023 (CTR).
January 17, 2023 Filing 154 AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Spirax Sarco Inc.(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 1/18/2023 (CTR).
January 17, 2023 Filing 153 AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 1/18/2023 (CTR).
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ENDORSED ORDER granting #151 Defendant Gardner Denver's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Todd Carlton Alley is terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Gardner Denver and relieved of any further responsibility as to Gardner Denver in this matter. Attorney Rebecca Kibbe is substituted as counsel of record for Gardner Denver. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/12/2023. (ACS)
January 11, 2023 Filing 151 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kibbe, Rebecca) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text on 1/11/2023 (MCB).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ENDORSED ORDER granting #142 Motion to Amend; granting #143 Motion to Amend; granting #144 Motion to Amend. As leave to amend should be freely granted when justice so requires, Defendants are granted leave to amend their answers and affirmative defenses. Amended answers and affirmative defenses shall be filed on or before January 20, 2023. The issue as to whether the Fabre doctrine applies in this case has not been determined at this stage of the litigation. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/6/2023. (CEH)
January 3, 2023 Filing 149 ***TERMINATED-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS A MOTION***NOTICE by Gardner Denver, Inc. Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant, Gardner Denver, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kibbe, Rebecca) Modified on 1/4/2023 (LSS).
December 19, 2022 Filing 148 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on July 18th, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. EST before Jonathan Hollingshead. (Thomas, Alexis)
October 28, 2022 Filing 147 RESPONSE in Opposition re #142 MOTION to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Thomas, Alexis) Modified on 10/31/2022 (CTR).
October 28, 2022 Filing 146 RESPONSE in Opposition re #143 MOTION to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Thomas, Alexis) Modified on 10/31/2022 (CTR).
October 28, 2022 Filing 145 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Thomas, Alexis) Modified on 10/31/2022 (CTR).
October 7, 2022 Filing 144 MOTION to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 10/7/2022 (CTR).
October 7, 2022 Filing 143 MOTION to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Spirax Sarco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 10/7/2022 (CTR).
October 7, 2022 Filing 142 MOTION to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 10/7/2022 (CTR).
September 27, 2022 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Hanson Horn on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ENDORSED ORDER granting #139 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Edward Reynolds, II terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 9/19/2022. (Flynn, Sean)
September 19, 2022 Filing 139 MOTION for Charles Reynolds to Withdraw as Attorney by Armstrong International, Inc. (Reynolds, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 9/19/2022 (CTR).
September 16, 2022 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Crane Co. identifying Corporate Parent Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC for Crane Co. (Johnson, Rasheem) Modified on 9/16/2022 (CTR).
September 16, 2022 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Rasheem Malik Johnson on behalf of Crane Co. (Johnson, Rasheem)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #135 Joint Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. The Court denied without prejudice the same filing on August 12, 2022 (see Doc. 95) (the only difference is the docketing attorney). Counsel is again directed to comply with Local Rule 2.02 (c) when moving to withdraw, which requires the withdrawing attorney (not a law firm) to file a motion rather than a stipulation. The movant is also advised that individual attorneys, not law firms, represent clients. Finally, the re-filed motion should state that the withdrawing attorney has complied with the notice requirements of Local Rule 2.02(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/31/2022. (ACS)
August 30, 2022 Filing 135 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Armstrong International, Inc. (Reynolds, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 8/30/2022 (CTR).
August 29, 2022 Filing 134 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand, Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Gardner Denver, Inc... (Alley, Todd)
August 29, 2022 Filing 133 NOTICE/Joint MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Enlarge Time to take Plaintiff, Arnold Edmonds' Deposition and Request for Additional Relief by Blackmer Pump Company, Flowserve Us, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc. (Alley, Todd) Modified on 8/29/2022 (CTR). Modified per chambers on 8/30/2022 (CTR).
August 19, 2022 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey A. Early on behalf of Arnold Edmonds (Early, Kelsey)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #130 Joint Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel, which the Court construes as a motion to substitute attorney. The motion does not comply with Local Rule 2.02(c), which requires a certification of notice to the client and also requires "[t]he withdrawing lawyer -- not the lawyer's present or former or another firm" to file the motion. The movant is advised that individual attorneys, not a law firm, represent clients. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/12/2022. (ACS)
August 10, 2022 Filing 130 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Horn, Hanson) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ENDORSED ORDER granting #127 Plaintiff's Motion for Paige Wojdyla to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paige Wojdyla is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorneys Alexis Thomas and Mark Alonzo will remain Plaintiff's counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 7/12/2022. (ACS)
July 12, 2022 Filing 128 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alexis Thomas on behalf of Arnold Edmonds. Lead Counsel: Alexis Thomas. (Thomas, Alexis)
July 12, 2022 Filing 127 MOTION for Paige Wojdyla to Withdraw as Attorney by Arnold Edmonds. (Wojdyla, Paige) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 8, 2022 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Weaver on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Weaver, Holly)
June 28, 2022 Filing 125 RESPONSE to Motion re #121 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion) to Enlarge Time to Take Plaintiff, Arnold Edmonds' Deposition and Request for Additional Relief and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Arnold Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wojdyla, Paige)
June 28, 2022 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Thomas on behalf of Arnold Edmonds (Thomas, Alexis)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an expedited response by Wednesday, June 29, 2022 to #121 Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Take Plaintiff Arnold Edmonds' Deposition and Request for Additional Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/24/2022. (DK)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/3/2023, Dispositive motions due by 8/4/2023, Pretrial statement due by 11/14/2023, All other motions due by 11/14/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2023 at 1:15 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 1/2/2024 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/8/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/23/2022. (BGS)
June 23, 2022 Filing 121 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion) to Enlarge Time to Take Plaintiff, Arnold Edmonds' Deposition and Request for Additional Relief and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Blackmer Pump Company, Flowserve Us, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Plaintiffs' Second Complaint, #3 Order Granting Motion to Consolidate, #4 General Electric Company's Notice of Removal, #5 Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories)(Alley, Todd) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Carrier Corporation and Elliott Company a/k/a Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc., only, are dismissed, without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Carrier Corporation and Elliott Company a/k/a Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc., as parties to this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/20/2022. (BGS)
June 17, 2022 Filing 119 NOTICE of change of address by Charles Edward Reynolds, II (Reynolds, Charles)
June 16, 2022 Filing 118 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Carrier Corporation and Elliott Company by Arnold Edmonds. (Wojdyla, Paige)
June 15, 2022 Filing 117 Case Reassigned to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. New case number: 8:22-cv-825-CEH-SPF. Judge Thomas P. Barber no longer assigned to the case. (Per Standing Order 8:19-mc-60) (AG)
June 14, 2022 Filing 116 NOTICE canceling Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 6/22/2022. (SRC)
June 13, 2022 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Shapiro on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Shapiro, Ari)
June 13, 2022 Filing 114 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corp.. (Garcia, Daniel)
June 13, 2022 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alberto Garcia on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Garcia, Daniel)
May 31, 2022 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Cachaldora, Amanda)
May 31, 2022 Filing 111 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Warren Pumps, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for Warren Pumps, LLC. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by IMO Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for IMO Industries, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by IMO Industries, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Aurora Pump Company. Related case(s): Yes (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Aurora Pump Company identifying Corporate Parent Pentair, Inc. for Aurora Pump Company. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburg for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 104 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 103 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 31, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE by Armstrong International, Inc. of Unavailability (Reynolds, Charles)
May 24, 2022 Filing 100 NOTICE of change of address by Christopher J. M. Collings (Collings, Christopher)
May 24, 2022 Filing 99 NOTICE of hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for JUNE 22, 2022, at 09:30 AM by Zoom Video Conference before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Participants will receive a Zoom invitation by separate email. (SRC)
May 20, 2022 Filing 98 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Alley, Todd)
May 17, 2022 Filing 97 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Howden North America.(Lehner, Steven)
May 9, 2022 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Metrolpolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Tacktill, Scott)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) and Plaintiff's "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, Alfa Laval Inc." (Doc. #93), this case is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. only , with each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to terminate Alfa Laval Inc. as a party. This dismissal does not affect any other party in this action. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 5/6/2022. (EKB)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ENDORSED ORDER: Because Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed his claims against Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. (Doc. #93), "Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction" (Doc. #26) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 5/6/2022. (EKB)
May 5, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Arnold Edmonds (Wojdyla, Paige)
May 4, 2022 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Howden North America identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Howden North America. (Lehner, Steven)
May 4, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howden North America. Related case(s): Yes (Lehner, Steven)
May 4, 2022 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Lehner on behalf of Howden North America (Lehner, Steven)
May 2, 2022 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Medina, Eduardo)
May 2, 2022 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Caterpillar Inc.. (Ferguson, Timothy)
April 27, 2022 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Arnold Edmonds. (Wojdyla, Paige)
April 27, 2022 Filing 86 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation.(Donet, Brianna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline St. Claire Villani on behalf of Lamons Gasket Company (Villani, Madeline)
April 26, 2022 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Elizabeth Donet on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Donet, Brianna)
April 25, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Flowserve Us, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Reddin, John)
April 25, 2022 Filing 82 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by FMC Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Reddin, John)
April 25, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Arnold Edmonds. Related case(s): Yes (Wojdyla, Paige)
April 25, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan S. Cobbs on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Cobbs, Ryan)
April 22, 2022 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Lamons Gasket Company. (Yount, Scott)
April 22, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lamons Gasket Company. Related case(s): Yes (Yount, Scott)
April 22, 2022 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Parker Yount on behalf of Lamons Gasket Company (Yount, Scott)
April 22, 2022 Filing 76 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bell & Gossett and Foster Engineering. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 75 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Grinnell LLL. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Goulps Pump LLC. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Elliot Company. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carrier Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by FMC Corporation. (Reddin, John)
April 22, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of FMC Corporation (Reddin, John)
April 22, 2022 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. (Drumm, Ashley Christina)
April 21, 2022 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation identifying Other Affiliate John Wood Group plc for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Collings, Christopher)
April 21, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Related case(s): No (Collings, Christopher)
April 21, 2022 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Flowserve Us, Inc.. (Reddin, John)
April 21, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of Flowserve Us, Inc. (Reddin, John)
April 21, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Christina Pearson Drumm on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Drumm, Ashley Christina)
April 20, 2022 Filing 63 SUMMONS issued as to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (LD)
April 19, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Charles Edward Reynolds, II on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Charles E. Reynolds. (Reynolds, Charles)
April 19, 2022 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Reynolds, Charles)
April 19, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Armstrong International, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Reynolds, Charles)
April 19, 2022 Filing 59 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Arnold Edmonds. (Wojdyla, Paige)
April 19, 2022 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by General Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent T-Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate General Electric Credit Corporation of Tennessee, Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Company, Other Affiliate GE Power India Limited, Other Affiliate GE T&D India Limited, Other Affiliate Indo Tech Transformers Limited, Other Affiliate Wuhan Boiler Company Ltd., Other Affiliate GE Capital European Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital International Funding Company Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate Security Capital Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate AerCap Holdings N.V., Other Affiliate GE Capital Australia Funding Pty. Ltd, Other Affiliate GE Capital Canada Funding Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital Funding, LLC, Other Affiliate GE Capital UK Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate GE SCF Societe En Commandite Par Actions for General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher)
April 19, 2022 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Paramount Global identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements Inc. for Paramount Global. (Collings, Christopher)
April 19, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Gardner Denver, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Flowserve Us, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Blackmer Pump Company. Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Paramount Global. Related case(s): No (Collings, Christopher)
April 18, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by General Electric Company. Related case(s): No (Collings, Christopher)
April 18, 2022 Filing 51 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Alley, Todd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 50 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Us, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve Us, Inc. (Alley, Todd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 49 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Blackmer Pump Company identifying Corporate Parent Dover Corporation for Blackmer Pump Company. (Alley, Todd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Ferguson on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
April 18, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Ferguson on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
April 15, 2022 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bell & Gossett and Foster Engineering identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for Bell & Gossett and Foster Engineering. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Grinnell LLL identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls plc f/k/a Tyco International plc for Grinnell LLL. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 44 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Goulps Pump LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for Goulps Pump LLC.. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 43 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Elliot Company identifying Corporate Parent EBARA CORPORATION, Corporate Parent Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliot Company.. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 42 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Bell & Gossett and Foster Engineering. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Grinnell LLL. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Goulps Pump LLC. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Elliot Company. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Carrier Corporation. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Spirax Sarco Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Spirax Sarco Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Spirax-Sarco Engineering, PLC, Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Investments, LTD, Other Affiliate Sarco International Corporation for Spirax Sarco Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AB Electrolux, Other Affiliate Electrolux Holdings, Inc. for Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 14, 2022 Filing 30 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 14, 2022 Filing 29 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc..(Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 14, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Aurora Pump Company.(Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 14, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE by Alfa Laval Inc. re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Kolos, Chris)
April 13, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert Madison, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Fla. Stat. 47.16 (1951))(Kolos, Chris)
April 13, 2022 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Alfa Laval Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval Inc.. (Kolos, Chris)
April 13, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Alfa Laval Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Kolos, Chris)
April 13, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Armstrong International, Inc..(Reynolds, Charles)
April 13, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 13, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 13, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 13, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 13, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 13, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 13, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Paige Wojdyla on behalf of Arnold Edmonds. Lead Counsel: Paige Wojdyla. (Wojdyla, Paige)
April 12, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 12, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Spirax Sarco Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 12, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Spirax Sarco Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Carlton Alley on behalf of Blackmer Pump Company, Flowserve Us, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc. (Alley, Todd)
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Martin Kocse on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Kocse, Ryan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Nick Kolos on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Kolos, Chris)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of Paramount Global. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher)
April 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of General Electric Company. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation Notice of Appearance Of Lead Counsel and Designation of Email Address (Collings, Christopher)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation of Joinder in General Electric Company's Notice of Removal (Collings, Christopher)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-0825-TPB-SPF. (SJB)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC., re #1 Notice of Removal of Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Collings, Christopher)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County, case number 22-CA-001513 filed in State Court on 2/22/22. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19432243 filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit A , #7 Exhibit A-1 , #8 Exhibit B , #9 Exhibit C , #10 Exhibit D , #11 Exhibit E (Collings, Christopher) Modified on 4/7/2022 (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmonds v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARNOLD EDMONDS
Represented By: Paige Wojdyla
Represented By: Mark A. Alonzo
Represented By: Alexis Thomas
Represented By: Kelsey A. Early
Represented By: Mary Ostrowski
Represented By: Madison McComas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFA LAVAL INC.
Represented By: Chris Nick Kolos
Represented By: Ryan Martin Kocse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DELAVAL SEPARATOR COMPANY
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARPLES CORP.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: Rasheem Malik Johnson
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEMING PUMP CO.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COCHRANE CORPORATION
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPMAN VALVE CO.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWARTWOUT CO.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOT COMPANY, a/k/a ELLIOT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Erin Dardis
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC., f/k/a CRANE PACKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORP., f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF STURTEVANT CO.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORP.
Represented By: Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Daniel Alberto Garcia
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR INC.
Represented By: Timothy J. Ferguson
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Kimberly Held Israel
Represented By: Alyssa Nicole Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN CORK & SEAL CO., INC.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: John Charles Reddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD VALVE, INC.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORDSTROM VALVES, INC.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD VOGT VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOGT VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: John Charles Reddin
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Monika Ledlova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLL, d/b/a GRINNELL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Eduardo J. Medina
Represented By: Timothy J. Ferguson
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENDIX CORPORATION
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Steven D. Lehner
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL & GOSSETT and FOSTER ENGINEERING
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMONS GASKET COMPANY a/k/a LAMONS METAL GASKET CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROLPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO INC.
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: Ashley Christina Pearson Drumm
Represented By: Ryan S. Cobbs
Represented By: Brianna Elizabeth Donet
Represented By: Holly Weaver
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: T. Stephen Corcoran
Represented By: Todd Stephen Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUIMBY PUMP CO.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Company
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Erin Dardis
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deming Pump Co.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Packing
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Erin Dardis
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacomcbs Inc.
Represented By: Erin Dardis
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Erin Dardis
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Erin Dardis
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. doing business as Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Pump Company
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulps Pump LLC
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLL
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Represented By: Scott Parker Yount
Represented By: Madeline St. Claire Villani
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metrolpolitan Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Scott A. Tacktill
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quimby Pump Co.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Edward Reynolds, II
Represented By: Hanson Horn
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Chris Nick Kolos
Represented By: Ryan Martin Kocse
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jonathan Hollingshead
Represented By: Jonathan C. Hollingshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?